Reports for Kontron Transportation Schweiz AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Kontron Transportation Schweiz AG
- Kontron Transportation Schweiz AG is currently active and the industry «Manufacturing of telecommunications equipment and consumer electronics». The legal headquarters are in Ittigen.
- The management consists of 6 persons. The company was founded on 21.09.1971.
- The last commercial register change was made on 26.04.2024. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of BE is CHE-103.644.683.
Management (6)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Richard Neussl,
Bernd Eder,
Daniel Pelizzoni,
Pascal Meuwly,
Shivani Jessica Summermatter
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
21.09.1971
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Ittigen
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-035.3.004.006-1
UID/VAT
CHE-103.644.683
Sector
Manufacturing of telecommunications equipment and consumer electronics
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Entwicklung und die Fabrikation sowie den Handel mit elektronischen Geräten. Sie kann Grundstücke erwerben, verwalten und verkaufen, Beteiligungen erwerben, Zweigniederlassungen errichten und andere Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern oder die direkt oder indirekt mit diesem in Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Bern | 13.02.2008 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BfB Société Fiduciaire Bourquin frères et Béran SA | Renens (VD) | <2004 | 12.02.2008 |
Other company names
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Kontron Transportation Schweiz AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006018654, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Kontron Transportation Schweiz AG, in Ittigen, CHE-103.644.683, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 4 vom 08.01.2024, Publ. 1005927202).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Götz, René, von Höri, in Neerach, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Rupf, Alain-Dominique, von Flums, in Männedorf, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Neussl, Richard, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Schwadorf (AT), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Eder, Bernd, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Wien (AT), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Pelizzoni, Daniel, von Zürich, in Gutenswil (Volketswil), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Meuwly, Pascal, von Tafers, in Düdingen, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Smmermatter, Shivani Jessica, von Randa, in Moosseedorf, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005927202, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Comlab AG, in Ittigen, CHE-103.644.683, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 225 vom 20.11.2023, Publ. 1005888397).
Statutenänderung:
24.11.2023.
Firma neu:
Kontron Transportation Schweiz AG.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.