Reports for Clemens Keller Treuhand AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Clemens Keller Treuhand AG
- Clemens Keller Treuhand AG is active in the industry «Fiduciary services» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Möhlin.
- There are 2 active persons registered in the management.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 27.10.2023, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company Clemens Keller Treuhand AG is registered under the UID CHE-305.516.399.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.03.2017
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Möhlin
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.442.461-2
UID/VAT
CHE-305.516.399
Sector
Fiduciary services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Führen eines Treuhand- und Steuerberatungsbüros; kann sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen, Tochtergesellschaften und Zweigniederlassungen errichten sowie Grundstücke erwerben, belasten und veräussern.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Clemens Keller Treuhand AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005870950, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Clemens Keller Treuhand AG, in Möhlin, CHE-305.516.399, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 64 vom 31.03.2017, Publ. 3438641).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Keller, Clemens, von Endingen, in Wallbach, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Keller, Fabio, von Endingen, in Wallbach, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 3438641, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Clemens Keller Treuhand AG, in Möhlin, CHE-305.516.399, Schallengasse 28, 4313 Möhlin, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
13.03.2017.
Zweck:
Führen eines Treuhand- und Steuerberatungsbüros;
kann sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen, Tochtergesellschaften und Zweigniederlassungen errichten sowie Grundstücke erwerben, belasten und veräussern.
Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Aktien:
100 vinkulierte Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00.
Qualifizierte Tatbestände:
Sacheinlage/Sachübernahme: Die Gesellschaft übernimmt bei der Gründung das Geschäft des im Handelsregister eingetragenen Einzelunternehmens Clemens Keller Treuhand, in Möhlin (CHE-109.421.236), gemäss Vermögensübertragungsvertrag vom 13.03.2017 und Inventar per 31.12.2016 mit Aktiven von CHF 146'364.95 und Passiven von CHF 19'309.10, wofür 100 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00 ausgegeben und CHF 27'055.85 als Forderung gutgeschrieben werden.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen durch Brief oder elektronische Post rechtsgültig an die letzte der Gesellschaft gemeldete Adresse.
Vinkulierung:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt. Gemäss Erklärung aller Gründer vom 13.03.2017 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Eingetragene Personen:
Keller, Clemens, von Endingen, in Wallbach, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Keller, Silvio, von Endingen, in Wallbach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.