Address
c/o Lic. iur. R. Zinniker
Frey-Herosé-Strasse 20
5000 Aarau
Reports for City-Markt Aarau AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout City-Markt Aarau AG
- City-Markt Aarau AG has its legal headquarters in Aarau, is active and operates in the sector «Other transportation services».
- The company was founded on 09.05.1983.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 28.07.2023. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The company City-Markt Aarau AG is registered under the UID CHE-108.819.576.
Management (11)
newest board members
Tina Kistler,
Fabian Laube,
Marcel Rothen,
Patrick François De Caes,
Sandra Sheila Pfister
newest authorized signatories
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
09.05.1983
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Aarau
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.005.085-8
UID/VAT
CHE-108.819.576
Sector
Other transportation services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Planung, Bau und Betrieb der gemeinsamen Anlagen, gemeinsame Erschliessung des beteiligten Grundeigentums nach aussen und gemeinsames Marke-ting. Ein allfälliger "kann Zweck" ist aus den Statuten zu entnehmen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
AWB Revisionen AG | Aarau | 30.10.2007 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ernst & Young AG | Aarau | <2004 | 29.10.2007 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: City-Markt Aarau AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005806536, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
City-Markt Aarau AG, in Aarau, CHE-108.819.576, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 163 vom 24.08.2022, Publ. 1005546758).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bracher, Thomas, von Affoltern im Emmental, in Olten, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Chotirat, Phailin, von Schaffhausen, in Zug, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kistler, Tina, von Böztal, in Bremgarten bei Bern, Vizepräsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Laube, Fabian, von Zurzach, in Gebenstorf, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Rothen, Marcel, von Rüschegg, in Muhen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
de Caes, Patrick, von Obersiggenthal, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1005546758, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
City-Markt Aarau AG, in Aarau, CHE-108.819.576, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 149 vom 04.08.2022, Publ. 1005535068).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Heid, Sven Daniel, von Riehen, in Oeschgen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1005535068, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
City-Markt Aarau AG, in Aarau, CHE-108.819.576, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 7 vom 11.01.2022, Publ. 1005378377).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Eichenberger, Bruno, von Burg (AG), in Kriens, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Kuen, Walter, von Zürich und Küsnacht ZH, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Mazzotta, Tiziana, italienische Staatsangehörige, in Lenzburg, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Pfister, Sandra Sheila, von Sumiswald, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.