Reports for CINEMA PALACE, société coopérative
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout CINEMA PALACE, société coopérative
- CINEMA PALACE, société coopérative with its legal headquarters in Bévilard is active. CINEMA PALACE, société coopérative operates in the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties».
- There are 6 active persons registered in the management.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 31.03.2016.
- In the commercial register the organization CINEMA PALACE, société coopérative is registered under the UID CHE-153.990.851.
Management (6)
newest members of the administration
Pierre-Alain Diacon,
Richard Garraux,
Pascal Reichen,
Daniel Salzmann,
Sophie Bilat
newest authorized signatories
Pierre-Alain Diacon,
Richard Garraux,
Pascal Reichen,
Daniel Salzmann,
Sophie Bilat
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
29.03.2011
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
Valbirse
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-036.5.050.333-2
UID/VAT
CHE-153.990.851
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société coopérative a pour but d'acquérir et gérer l'immeuble « Cinéma Palace » à Bévilard, dans le but de favoriser ou de garantir, par une action commune, les intérêts économiques déterminés de ses membres. Elle peut réaliser des emprunts si besoin est. Elle peut louer tout ou partie d'immeuble. La société peut encourager, soutenir et organiser des activités et des manifestations.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: CINEMA PALACE, société coopérative
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 2751131, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
CINEMA PALACE, société coopérative, à Valbirse, CHE-153.990.851, société coopérative (No. FOSC 56 du 23.03.2015, Publ. 2057981).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Voirol, Cyrille, de Les Genevez (JU), à Bévilard (Valbirse), membre, avec signature collective à deux;
Zwahlen, Serge, de Rüschegg, à Bévilard (Valbirse), membre, avec signature collective à deux;
Monnerat, Serge, de Vermes, à Malleray (Valbirse), membre, sans droit de signature;
Nyffeler, Fanny, de Huttwil, à Court, membre, sans droit de signature.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Bilat, Sophie, de Muriaux, à Bévilard (Valbirse), membre de l'administration, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: Billat, Sophie, membre, sans droit de signature].
Publication number: 2057981, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
CINEMA PALACE, société coopérative, à Bévilard, CHE-153.990.851, société coopérative (No. FOSC 65 du 01.04.2011, Publ. 6103348).
Nouveau siège:
Valbirse. [Modification d'office du siège par suite de fusion de communes].
Publication number: 6103348, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
CINEMA PALACE, société coopérative, à Bévilard, CH-036.5.050.333-2, rue Aimé Charpilloz 13, 2735 Bévilard, société coopérative (nouvelle inscription).
Date des statuts:
28.02.2011.
But:
La société coopérative a pour but d'acquérir et gérer l'immeuble « Cinéma Palace » à Bévilard, dans le but de favoriser ou de garantir, par une action commune, les intérêts économiques déterminés de ses membres. Elle peut réaliser des emprunts si besoin est. Elle peut louer tout ou partie d'immeuble. La société peut encourager, soutenir et organiser des activités et des manifestations.
Parts sociales:
Parts sociales de CHF 100.00.
Obligations:
Obligation de fournir des prestations: selon statuts.
Organe de publication:
FOSC.
Communications aux associés:
par lettre, télécopie ou courriel avec quittance d'envoi). Selon déclaration du 28.02.2011, il est renoncé à un contrôle restreint.
Personne(s) inscrite(s):
Reichen, Pascal, de Frutigen, à Bévilard, président, avec signature collective à deux;
Diacon, Pierre-Alain, de Dombresson, à Bévilard, vice-président, avec signature collective à deux;
Garraux, Richard, de Malleray, à Bévilard, secrétaire, avec signature collective à deux;
Jufer, Jacques-Henri, de Melchnau, à Bévilard, caissier, avec signature collective à deux;
Salzmann, Daniel, de Eggiwil, à Malleray, membre, avec signature collective à deux;
Voirol, Cyrille, de Les Genevez JU, à Bévilard, membre, avec signature collective à deux;
Zwahlen, Serge, de Rüschegg, à Bévilard, membre, avec signature collective à deux;
Billat, Sophie, de Muriaux, à Bévilard, membre, sans droit de signature;
Monnerat, Serge, de Vermes, à Malleray, membre, sans droit de signature;
Nyffeler, Fanny, de Huttwil, à Court, membre, sans droit de signature.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.