Reports for CHRIST & HEIRI Holding AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout CHRIST & HEIRI Holding AG
- CHRIST & HEIRI Holding AG with its legal headquarters in Zug is active. CHRIST & HEIRI Holding AG operates in the sector «Business management and administration».
- The company was founded on 16.09.2015 and has 5 persons in its management.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 09.04.2024, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company's UID is CHE-454.992.877.
- Companies with the same address as CHRIST & HEIRI Holding AG: Digital Security Holding AG, Red or Blue Labs AG.
Management (5)
newest board members
Uwe Tomschin,
Arno Heiri,
Marc Erni,
Dr. Rudolf Huber,
Peter Weigelt
newest authorized signatories
Uwe Tomschin,
Arno Heiri,
Marc Erni,
Dr. Rudolf Huber,
Peter Weigelt
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
16.09.2015
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Zug
Commercial Registry Office
ZG
Commercial register number
CH-170.3.039.972-0
UID/VAT
CHE-454.992.877
Sector
Business management and administration
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Juristische wie auch wirtschaftlich einheitliche Leitung des CHRIST & HEIRI-Konzerns; vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Grenchen | 29.11.2019 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Rüfenacht Heer Partner AG | Solothurn | 21.09.2015 | 28.11.2019 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- ME Holding AG, Zug
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: CHRIST & HEIRI Holding AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006004229, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
CHRIST & HEIRI Holding AG, in Zug, CHE-454.992.877, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 51 vom 14.03.2023, Publ. 1005699767).
Statutenänderung:
28.03.2024.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen per Brief, E-Mail oder in einer Form die den Nachweis durch Text ermöglicht an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen. [Ferner Änderung nicht publikationspflichtiger Tatsachen].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Tomschin, Uwe, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Fischenthal, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005699767, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
CHRIST & HEIRI Holding AG, in Zug, CHE-454.992.877, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 70 vom 09.04.2020, Publ. 1004869185).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Häring, Paul, von Bösingen, in Gersau, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004869185, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
CHRIST & HEIRI Holding AG, in Zug, CHE-454.992.877, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 232 vom 29.11.2019, Publ. 1004771091).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Heiri, Arno, von Selzach, in Selzach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten];
Häring, Paul, von Bösingen, in Gersau, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten];
Weigelt, Peter, von St. Gallen, in Speicher, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten];
Huber, Rudolf, von Mettmenstetten, in Freienbach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.