Address
Chemin de la Racca 15
1618 Châtel-St-Denis
Reports for Charitable Hospice St-Joseph
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Charitable Hospice St-Joseph
- Charitable Hospice St-Joseph is a Foundation with its legal headquarters in Châtel-St-Denis. Charitable Hospice St-Joseph belongs to the industry «Operation of nursing homes and inpatient facilities» and is currently active.
- The management of the organization Charitable Hospice St-Joseph, which was founded on the 21.02.2006, consists of 8 persons.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 07.04.2022.
- The organization Charitable Hospice St-Joseph is registered under the UID CHE-112.784.900.
Management (8)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Marielle Anne Marie Elisabeth Colliard,
Jérôme Volery,
Colette Iriarte,
Pierre Balmat,
Damien Maurice Colliard
newest authorized signatories
Marielle Anne Marie Elisabeth Colliard,
Jérôme Volery,
Pierre Balmat
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
21.02.2006
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Châtel-Saint-Denis
Commercial Registry Office
FR
Commercial register number
CH-217.3.534.966-1
UID/VAT
CHE-112.784.900
Sector
Operation of nursing homes and inpatient facilities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Exploitation d'une institution dans laquelle sont admises pour y vivre à demeure, ou sporadiquement, des personnes en principe âgées, dépendantes médicalement et socialement, et dont l'état de santé nécessite une surveillance médicale limitée et/ou une aide pour l'accomplissement des actes de la vie quotidienne. La fondation ne poursuit aucun but lucratif.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fidac Conseils Sàrl | Châtel-Saint-Denis | 29.03.2018 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduconsult Bulle SA | Bulle | 30.05.2017 | 28.03.2018 | |
Fiduconsult & Jeckelmann S.A. | Bulle | 01.03.2006 | 29.05.2017 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Charitable Hospice St-Joseph
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005445422, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Charitable Hospice St-Joseph, à Châtel-Saint-Denis, CHE-112.784.900 (FOSC du 25.02.2021, p. 0/1005109815).
Transfert de patrimoine:
selon contrat et avenant authentiques des 09.06.2021 et 22.12.2021, inventaire au 31.12.2020 et selon décision de l'autorité de surveillance du 10.02.2022, la fondation a transféré des actifs de CHF 32'222'926.60 et des passifs envers les tiers de CHF 25'018'950.02 à Réseau Santé et Social de la Veveyse (RSSV) (CHE-421.790.203), à Châtel-Saint-Denis.
Contre-prestation:
aucune.
Publication number: HR02-1005109815, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Charitable Hospice St-Joseph, à Châtel-Saint-Denis, CHE-112.784.900 (FOSC du 21.12.2020, p. 0/1005053363).
Personne radiée:
Loup François, secrétaire hors conseil, directeur, signature collective à deux.
Personne inscrite modifiée:
Colliard Marielle Anne Marie Elisabeth, membre du conseil de fondation, sans signature, désormais membre du conseil de fondation, secrétaire, signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1005053363, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Charitable Hospice St-Joseph, à Châtel-Saint-Denis, CHE-112.784.900 (FOSC du 26.11.2019, p. 0/1004768139).
Personne radiée:
Wittenwiler Annalise, membre du conseil de fondation, présidente, signature collective à deux.
Personne inscrite modifié:
Volery Jérôme, membre du conseil de fondation, sans signature, maintenant membre du conseil de fondation, président, signature collective à deux.
Nouvelle personne inscrite:
Iriarte Colette, de Vuisternens-devant-Romont, à Châtel-Saint-Denis, membre du conseil de fondation, sans signature.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.