Address
Chemin Eugène Charlet 18
1228 Plan-les-Ouates
Reports for CG Agencements SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout CG Agencements SA
- CG Agencements SA with its legal headquarters in Plan-les-Ouates is active. CG Agencements SA operates in the sector «General structural engineering».
- The management of the company CG Agencements SA consists of 5 persons.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 31.05.2021.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-103.887.990.
Management (5)
newest board members
Carmine Graziano,
Martine Graziano,
Simon Graziano,
Fabrice John Strobino
newest authorized signatories
Dr. Karima Boubekeur,
Carmine Graziano,
Martine Graziano,
Simon Graziano,
Fabrice John Strobino
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
19.09.1984
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Plan-les-Ouates
Commercial Registry Office
GE
Commercial register number
CH-660.0.517.984-0
UID/VAT
CHE-103.887.990
Sector
General structural engineering
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Tous travaux dans le domaine de la construction, exploitation d'un département d'agencements d'intérieur et d'un atelier de constructions métalliques et de serrurerie, ainsi que toutes prestations de services dans ces domaines (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Auditor
Former auditor (5)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire DRP SA | Genève | 22.09.2014 | 20.11.2014 | |
Société Fiduciaire Prévisia SA | Carouge (GE) | 11.02.2013 | 21.09.2014 | |
EXCO Expertises & Conseils SA | Carouge (GE) | 24.09.2007 | 09.10.2012 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- CG Cuisines SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: CG Agencements SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005199420, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
CG Agencements SA, à Plan-les-Ouates, CHE-103.887.990 (FOSC du 11.02.2021, p. 0/1005098748). Le 01.05.2021, les actions au porteur ont été converties de par la loi en actions nominatives. Les statuts de la société n'ont pas encore été adaptés à la conversion, mais devront l'être lors de la prochaine modification.
Capital-actions:
CHF 300'000, libéré à concurrence de CHF 300'000, divisé en 300 actions de CHF 1'000, nominatives.
Publication number: HR02-1005098748, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
CG Agencements SA, à Plan-les-Ouates, CHE-103.887.990 (FOSC du 20.08.2018, p. 0/4424079). L'administrateur Graziano Carmin, jusqu'ici délégué, nommé président, signe désormais individuellement;
ses pouvoirs sont modifiés en ce sens, L'administrateur Strobino Fabrice, jusqu'ici président, maintenant délégué, continue à signer collectivement à deux. Signature collective à deux, avec Graziano Carmin ou Strobino Fabrice a été conférée à Boubekeur Karima, de France, à Riehen.
Publication number: 4424079, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
CG Agencements SA, à Plan-les-Ouates, CHE-103.887.990 (FOSC du 23.12.2016, p. 0/3245461). Graziano Laurent n'est plus administrateur;
ses pouvoirs sont radiés.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.