Reports for Centre Holdings SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Centre Holdings SA
- Centre Holdings SA is active in the industry «Operation of other financial institutions» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Champéry.
- The management consists of 3 persons. The company was founded on 09.04.2008.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 02.02.2021. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The UID registered in the commercial register of VS is CHE-114.167.523.
- Centre Gourmand SA, Centre Investissements SA, L'Epicentre SA have the same address as Centre Holdings SA.
Management (3)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Marc Guy Vladimir Winteler,
Nicole Peyrot Winteler,
William Paterson-Brown
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
09.04.2008
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Champéry
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-621.3.007.202-5
UID/VAT
CHE-114.167.523
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Acquisition et administration de participation à d'autres sociétés en Suisse et à l'étranger, notamment dans les domaines immobiliers et loisirs; la société peut fonder ou financer des entreprises en rapport avec son but; la société pourra effectuer, soit pour son propre compte, soit pour le compte de tiers, toutes autres activités de toute nature, notamment financières, commerciales, industrielles, mobilières et immobilières convergentes, à l'exception d'immeubles soumis à la LFAIE, en Suisse et à l'étranger, se rattachant directement ou indirectement à son but principal; elle peut octroyer des prêts ou d'autres financements, rémunérés ou non, à ses actionnaires directs ou indirects ainsi qu'à leurs filiales directes ou indirectes et consentir des sûretés de toute nature pour les obligations de ces sociétés, y compris des garanties, des gages et des cessions fiduciaires d'actifs de la société.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
VIFRO REVISIONS ET CONSEILS SA | Nyon | 15.04.2008 | 01.02.2021 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Centre Holdings SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005090032, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Centre Holdings SA, à Champéry, CHE-114.167.523, société anonyme (No. FOSC 231 du 28.11.2019, Publ. 1004770547). Selon déclaration du 26.11.2020, il est renoncé à un contrôle restreint.
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
VIFRO REVISIONS ET CONSEILS SA, à Nyon (CH-621.3.001.232-3), organe de révision.
Publication number: HR02-1004770547, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Centre Holdings SA, à Champéry, CHE-114.167.523, société anonyme (No. FOSC 72 du 12.04.2019, Publ. 1004610056).
Modification des statuts:
22.11.2019.
Nouveau but:
acquisition et administration de participation à d'autres sociétés en Suisse et à l'étranger, notamment dans les domaines immobiliers et loisirs;
la société peut fonder ou financer des entreprises en rapport avec son but;
la société pourra effectuer, soit pour son propre compte, soit pour le compte de tiers, toutes autres activités de toute nature, notamment financières, commerciales, industrielles, mobilières et immobilières convergentes, à l'exception d'immeubles soumis à la LFAIE, en Suisse et à l'étranger, se rattachant directement ou indirectement à son but principal;
elle peut octroyer des prêts ou d'autres financements, rémunérés ou non, à ses actionnaires directs ou indirects ainsi qu'à leurs filiales directes ou indirectes et consentir des sûretés de toute nature pour les obligations de ces sociétés, y compris des garanties, des gages et des cessions fiduciaires d'actifs de la société.
Publication number: HR02-1004610056, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Centre Holdings SA, à Monthey, CHE-114.167.523, société anonyme (No. FOSC 125 du 30.06.2017, Publ. 3615131).
Modification des statuts:
02.04.2019.
Nouveau siège:
Champéry.
Nouvelle adresse:
Rue du Village 58, 1874 Champéry.
Autre adresse:
c/o ZICA SA, Rue Neuve-du-Molard 8, 1204 Genève.
Nouvelles communications aux actionnaires:
par avis inséré dans la FOSC ou lettre recommandée pour les convocations aux assemblées générales et par écrit ou courriel pour les autres communications.
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Field, Simon John, citoyen britannique, à Genève, administrateur, avec signature collective à deux avec le président;
Pritchard, Raymond Glyn, de Chardonne, à Chardonne, administrateur, avec signature collective à deux avec le président.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Paterson-Brown, William, citoyen britannique, à Genève, président, avec signature individuelle [précédemment: président, avec signature collective à deux];
Winteler, Marc, de Glarus Nord, à Thônex, administrateur, avec signature individuelle;
Peyrot Winteler, Nicole, de Chêne-Bougeries et Genève, à Thônex, directrice, avec signature individuelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.