Reports for First Board Services AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout First Board Services AG
- First Board Services AG from Zürich operates in the sector «Services regarding management consulting» and is active.
- The management of the company First Board Services AG consists of 10 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 04.05.2010.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 12.07.2024.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of ZH under the UID CHE-115.651.804.
- There are 13 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: Altamura Immobilien AG, AUCTORIANA-ANSTALT, Vaduz, Zweigniederlassung Zürich, Barclays Bank (Suisse) SA, Zurich branch.
Management (10)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Julia Klara Maria Seebacher,
Peter-John Vickers,
Peter Paul Grüter,
Alessia Ravidà,
Alexandra Lingg
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
04.05.2010
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.035.121-1
UID/VAT
CHE-115.651.804
Sector
Services regarding management consulting
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Der Zweck der Gesellschaft besteht in der Gründung und Verwaltung von Stiftungen und Gesellschaften; der Übernahme von Stiftungsrats- und Verwaltungsratsmandaten; der Beratung von Stiftungs- und Verwaltungsräten; der Erbringung von Leistungen und Beratungen für die Führung und Kontrolle von Stiftungen, Gesellschaften und anderen juristischen Personen sowie Personengesellschaften. Sie kann treuhänderisch Stiftungen und Gesellschaften führen sowie Beratungs- und Treuhanddienstleistungen aller Art erbringen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Zürich | 01.12.2014 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Zürich | 06.12.2013 | 30.11.2014 | |
KPMG AG | Zürich | 10.05.2010 | 05.12.2013 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- First Board Services SA
- First Board Services Ltd
- CDM Trust & Board Services SA
- CDM Trust & Board Services Ltd
- CDM Trust & Board Services AG
- CDM Board Services AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: First Board Services AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006082529, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
First Board Services AG, in Zürich, CHE-115.651.804, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 105 vom 03.06.2024, Publ. 1006045862).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Eggenberger, Pascal, von Grabs, in Schaan (LI), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Fankhauser, Monique, von Trub, in Uitikon, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Seebacher, Julia Klara Maria, von Massagno, in Wollerau, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Vickers, Peter John, von Genève, in Zürich, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1006045862, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
First Board Services AG, in Zürich, CHE-115.651.804, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 97 vom 22.05.2024, Publ. 1006036574).
Fusion:
Übernahme der Aktiven und Passiven der FITRUST, FIDUCIAIRE ET TRUSTEE S.A., in Zürich (CHE-100.105.272), gemäss Fusionsvertrag vom 13.05.2024 und Bilanz per 31.12.2023. Aktiven von CHF 911'039.17 und Passiven (Fremdkapital) von CHF 211'032.41 gehen auf die übernehmende Gesellschaft über. Da dieselbe Aktionärin sämtliche Aktien der an der Fusion beteiligten Gesellschaften hält, findet weder eine Kapitalerhöhung noch eine Aktienzuteilung statt.
Publication number: HR02-1006036574, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
First Board Services AG, in Zürich, CHE-115.651.804, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 246 vom 19.12.2023, Publ. 1005913529).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Fankhauser, Monique, von Trub, in Uitikon, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Schlieren].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.