About CANCERSICO Stiftung
- The management of the company CANCERSICO Stiftung consists of 0 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 28.05.2008.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 22.10.2022, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- Companies with an identical address: ADVENTURE OF LIFETIME AG, ALLOCO TRUST REG., ALM Paradise Property Establishment.
Ownership structure
Holdings
Latest notifications for CANCERSICO Stiftung
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 10216/2022, (1)
CANCERSICO Stiftung, in Vaduz, FL-0002.217.375-1, Eingetragene Stiftung.
Repräsentanz/Zustelladresse neu:
c/o TROY Financial Advisors AG, Bahnstrasse 3, 9494 Schaan.
Publication number: 20177794, (1)
Handelsregister 11/04/2014, CANCERSICO Stiftung, Vaduz (FL-0002.217.375-1)Stiftung Repräsentanz/Zustelladresse neu: c/o NGM Aktiengesellschaft, Neugasse 15, 9490 Vaduz.
Erloschene Angaben zur Verwaltung:
Kieber, Dr. iur . Daniel Johannes, StA: Liechtenstein, 9490 Vaduz, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Nuener, Dr. iur . Erek Bertram, StA: Liechtenstein, 9490 Vaduz, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Angaben zur Verwaltung neu oder mutierend:
Tuppa, Dr. Georg Wolfgang, StA: Österreich, 6800 Feldkirch, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Meusburger, Mag. Christina, StA: Österreich, 9490 Vaduz, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 20158986, (1)
Handelsregister 21/06/2013, CANCERSICO Stiftung, Vaduz (FL-0002.217.375-1)Stiftung Repräsentanz/Zustelladresse neu: c/o IMT Financial Advisors AG, Austrasse 56, 9490 Vaduz.
Angaben zur Verwaltung neu oder mutierend:
Kieber, Dr. iur . Daniel Johannes, StA: Liechtenstein, 9490 Vaduz, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates mit Einzelunterschrift];
Nuener, Dr. iur . Erek Bertram, StA: Liechtenstein, 9490 Vaduz, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates mit Einzelunterschrift];
Tuppa, Dr. Georg Wolfgang, StA: Österreich, 6800 Feldkirch, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.