Reports for Camping du Lac GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Camping du Lac GmbH
- Camping du Lac GmbH is a Limited liability company with its legal headquarters in Iseltwald. Camping du Lac GmbH belongs to the industry «Operation of campgrounds» and is currently active.
- The company was founded on 13.07.1999.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 03.01.2023.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Camping du Lac GmbH is the following: CHE-105.209.269.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
13.07.1999
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Iseltwald
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-092.4.011.025-0
UID/VAT
CHE-105.209.269
Sector
Operation of campgrounds
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft vermietet Campingplätze. Die Gesellschaft kann alle Geschäfte eingehen, Verträge abschliessen und Darlehen gewähren, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern, die direkt oder indirekt damit in Zusammenhang stehen. Ferner kann sie Zweigniederlassungen errichten und sich an Unternehmungen beteiligen oder sich mit diesen zusammenschliessen. Die Gesellschaft kann Grundstücke erwerben, halten und veräussern.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Camping du Lac GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005642982, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Camping du Lac GmbH, in Iseltwald, CHE-105.209.269, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 167 vom 31.08.2015, S.0, Publ. 2346313).
Domizil neu:
Schoren 7c, 3807 Iseltwald.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Abegglen, Fritz, von Iseltwald, in Iseltwald, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 20'000.00;
Abegglen-Hohler, Elsbeth, von Iseltwald und Zuzgen, in Iseltwald, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 20'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Heimberg, Hans Ulrich, von Oberwil im Simmental, in Ringgenberg BE, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 20'000.00;
Heimberg-Matter, Franziska, von Oberwil im Simmental und Kölliken, in Ringgenberg BE, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 20'000.00.
Publication number: 2346313, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Camping du Lac GmbH, in Iseltwald, CHE-105.209.269, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 89 vom 11.05.2009, S. 4, Publ. 5012142). [Der Hinweis betreffend Liberierung Stammkapital wird gestrichen, da nicht zur Eintragung gehörend] [gestrichen: Liberierung Stammkapital: CHF 40'000.--.].
Publication number: 5012142, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Camping du Lac GmbH, in Iseltwald, CH-092.4.011.025-0, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 142 vom 26.07.1999, S. 5074). Gemäss Erklärung der Geschäftsführung vom 25.11.2008 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Abegglen, Fritz, von Iseltwald, in Iseltwald, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 20'000.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer mit Einzelunterschrift].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.