Reports for Blättler Investment Holding AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Blättler Investment Holding AG
- Blättler Investment Holding AG has its legal headquarters in Beringen, is active and operates in the sector «Operation of other financial institutions».
- The management of the company Blättler Investment Holding AG consists of 2 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 29.12.2003.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 22.07.2022.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-110.365.490.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
29.12.2003
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Beringen
Commercial Registry Office
SH
Commercial register number
CH-290.3.014.631-6
UID/VAT
CHE-110.365.490
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Halten von Beteiligungen an Handels- und Fabrikationsgesellschaften.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
OBT AG | Zürich | 22.07.2022 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Mannhart + Fehr Treuhand AG | Schaffhausen | 15.07.2004 | 21.07.2022 | |
Trevi-Treuhand, Rolf Degen | Oberwil (BL) | <2004 | 14.07.2004 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Blättler Investment Holding AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005527147, Commercial Registry Office Schaffhausen, (290)
Blättler Investment Holding AG, in Beringen, CHE-110.365.490, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 217 vom 09.11.2009, S.15, Publ. 5333118).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Mannhart + Fehr Treuhand AG, in Schaffhausen, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
OBT AG (CHE-384.364.751), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 5333118, Commercial Registry Office Schaffhausen, (290)
Blättler Investment Holding AG, in Thayngen, CH-290.3.014.631-6, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 135 vom 15.07.2004, S. 12, Publ. 2360220).
Statutenänderung:
29.10.2009.
Sitz neu:
Beringen.
Domizil neu:
Industriestrasse 11, 8222 Beringen.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen per Brief, E-Mail oder Telefax an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen.
Vinkulierung neu:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Aktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt.
Publication number: 2360220, Commercial Registry Office Schaffhausen, (290)
Blättler Investment Holding AG, in Thayngen, CH-290.3.014.631-6, Halten von Beteiligungen an Handels- und Fabrikationsgesellschaften, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 2 vom 06.01.2004, S. 12, Publ. 2058286).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Trevi-Treuhand, Rolf Degen, in Oberwil BL, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Mannhart + Fehr Treuhand AG, in Schaffhausen, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.