Address
c/o José Carlos Fernandes Demétrio
Les Chenevières 106
2338 Les Emibois
Reports for Black Hill Invest SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Black Hill Invest SA
- Black Hill Invest SA is active in the industry «Operation of other financial institutions» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Les Emibois.
- The management has one active person registered.
- On the 19.12.2023 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-437.367.394.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
05.04.2019
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Muriaux
Commercial Registry Office
JU
Commercial register number
CH-670.3.008.131-6
UID/VAT
CHE-437.367.394
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Acquisition et administration de participations pour son compte ou pour le compte de tiers, comme représentante ou à titre fiduciaire, à des entreprises commerciales, industrielles, financières et immobilières, sises en Suisse ou à l'étranger, par prise d'actions, d'obligations, de parts, détention de créances sous toute autre forme adéquate (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Black Hill Invest SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005914841, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Black Hill Invest SA, à Muriaux, CHE-437.367.394, société anonyme (No. FOSC 70 du 10.04.2019, Publ. 1004608090).
Autres adresses:
c/o ALNI fiduciaire SA, Chemin de St-Nicolas 26, 2350 Saignelégier. Par décision du Tribunal de Première Instance à Porrentruy du 30.11.2023, le Juge civil a nommé un commissaire en application de l'art. 731b CO.
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Fernandes Demétrio, José Carlos, ressortissant portugais, à Les Emibois (Muriaux), administrateur, avec signature individuelle.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Froidevaux, Nicolas Jean Albert, de Le Bémont (JU), à Saignelégier, commissaire, avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: HR01-1004608090, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Black Hill Invest SA, à Muriaux, CHE-437.367.394, c/o José Carlos Fernandes Demétrio, Les Chenevières 106, 2338 Les Emibois, société anonyme (Nouvelle inscription).
Date des statuts:
05.04.2019.
But:
Acquisition et administration de participations pour son compte ou pour le compte de tiers, comme représentante ou à titre fiduciaire, à des entreprises commerciales, industrielles, financières et immobilières, sises en Suisse ou à l'étranger, par prise d'actions, d'obligations, de parts, détention de créances sous toute autre forme adéquate (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Capital-actions:
CHF 100'000.00.
Capital-actions libéré:
CHF 100'000.00.
Actions:
100'000 actions nominatives de CHF 1.00.
Organe de publication:
FOSC.
Communications aux actionnaires:
par écrit ou par courriel.
Restriction à la transmissibilité:
Restriction à la transmissibilité des actions nominatives: selon statuts. Selon déclaration du 05.04.2019, il est renoncé à un contrôle restreint.
Personne(s) inscrite(s):
Fernandes Demétrio, José Carlos, ressortissant portugais, à Les Emibois (Muriaux), administrateur, avec signature individuelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.