Reports for Berghotel Sartons AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Berghotel Sartons AG
- Berghotel Sartons AG has its legal headquarters in Valbella and is active. It operates in the sector «Operation of hotels, inns and B&B/guesthouses».
- The management of the company Berghotel Sartons AG, which was founded on the 06.10.2003, consists of one person.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 11.12.2009.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Berghotel Sartons AG is the following: CHE-110.246.974.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
06.10.2003
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Vaz/Obervaz
Commercial Registry Office
GR
Commercial register number
CH-350.3.007.964-8
UID/VAT
CHE-110.246.974
Sector
Operation of hotels, inns and B&B/guesthouses
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Betrieb eines Berghotels und Bergrestaurants; die Gesellschaft kann ferner alle direkt oder indirekt mit dem Gesellschaftszweck oder mit der Anlage ihres Vermögens in Verbindung stehenden Geschäfte auf eigene Rechnung oder auf Rechnung Dritter tätigen. Sie kann sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen und jederzeit Filialen errichten oder bestehende Filialen aufheben.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Rupp Treuhand AG | Chur | <2004 | 10.12.2009 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Berghotel Sartons AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 5388722, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Berghotel Sartons AG, in Vaz/Obervaz, CH-350.3.007.964-8, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 195 vom 10.10.2003, S. 5, Publ. 1209594).
Statutenänderung:
26.11.2009.
Liberierung Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 100'000.00 [bisher: CHF 50'000.00]. Gemäss Erklärung vom 26.11.2009 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Rupp Treuhand AG, in Chur, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 1209594, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Berghotel Sartons AG, in Vaz/Obervaz, Sartons, 7077 Valbella, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
3.10.2003.
Zweck:
Betrieb eines Berghotels und Bergrestaurants;
die Gesellschaft kann ferner alle direkt oder indirekt mit dem Gesellschaftszweck oder mit der Anlage ihres Vermögens in Verbindung stehenden Geschäfte auf eigene Rechnung oder auf Rechnung Dritter tätigen. Sie kann sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen und jederzeit Filialen errichten oder bestehende Filialen aufheben.
Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 50'000.
Aktien:
100 Namenaktien zu CHF 1 000.--.
Qualifizierte Tatbestände:
Sacheinlage/Sachübernahme: Die Gesellschaft übernimmt bei der Gründung das Geschäft der Einzelfirma Berghotel/Restaurant Sartons, Schäfer D., in Valbella, Gemeinde Vaz/Obervaz, gemäss Vertrag vom 03.10.2003 und Bilanz per 31.08.2003 mit Aktiven von CHF 157'295.31 und Passiven (Fremdkapital) von CHF 106'015.05, wofür 100 Namenaktien zu CHF 1 000, zu 50 % liberiert, ausgegeben und CHF 1'280.26 gutgeschrieben werden.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Die Mitteilungen der Gesellschaft an die Aktionäre erfolgen durch Brief an die im Aktienbuch eingetragenen Adressen.
Vinkulierung:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt.
Eingetragene Personen:
Schäfer, Dominik, von Basel und Seltisberg, in Valbella, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Rupp Treuhand AG, in Chur, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.