Reports for Bergbahnen Obersaxen AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Bergbahnen Obersaxen AG
- Bergbahnen Obersaxen AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Obersaxen. Bergbahnen Obersaxen AG belongs to the industry «Transportation of passenger and freight by road» and is currently active.
- The company was founded on 13.07.1967.
- The last commercial register change was made on 16.02.2024. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Bergbahnen Obersaxen AG is the following: CHE-108.084.219.
- The address is identical with 2 other active companies. These include: Bergbahnen Piz Mundaun AG, Gipfelrestaurant Sezner Balazs Fojtyik.
Management (5)
newest board members
Norbert von Sax,
Ernst Sax,
Carlo Janka,
Fabio Bianchi,
Iso Caduff
newest authorized signatories
Norbert von Sax,
Ernst Sax,
Carlo Janka,
Fabio Bianchi,
Iso Caduff
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
13.07.1967
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Obersaxen Mundaun
Commercial Registry Office
GR
Commercial register number
CH-350.3.003.372-7
UID/VAT
CHE-108.084.219
Sector
Transportation of passenger and freight by road
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Bau und Betrieb von touristischen Beförderungsanlagen, von Freizeit- und Sporteinrichtungen, von Hotel- und Restaurationsbetrieben, Kauf und Verkauf und Verwaltung von Immobilien sowie Handel mit Sport-, Souvenier- und Bekleidungsartikeln; die Gesellschaft kann sich auch an anderen, ähnlichen Unternehmungen beteiligen und alle Geschäfte tätigen, welche zur Förderung des Zweckes als geeignet erscheinen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
TNC Treuhand Norbert Cavegn AG | Lumnezia | 31.10.2013 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Confidar Revision AG | Ilanz/Glion | <2004 | 30.10.2013 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Seilbahnen Obersaxen AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Bergbahnen Obersaxen AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005963490, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Bergbahnen Obersaxen AG, in Obersaxen Mundaun, CHE-108.084.219, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 197 vom 11.10.2018, Publ. 1004474748).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Brunner, Josef, von Domat/Ems, in Ilanz (Ilanz/Glion), Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Caduff, Sigisbert, von Lumnezia, in Obersaxen Mundaun, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Sax, Ernst, von Obersaxen Mundaun, in Obersaxen Mundaun, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Sax, Norbert, von Obersaxen Mundaun, in Obersaxen Mundaun, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Bianchi, Fabio, von Lostallo, in Obersaxen Mundaun, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Caduff, Iso, von Lumnezia, in Ilanz/Glion, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Janka, Carlo, von Obersaxen Mundaun, in Obersaxen Mundaun, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004474748, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Bergbahnen Obersaxen AG, in Obersaxen Mundaun, CHE-108.084.219, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 28 vom 10.02.2016, Publ. 2658771).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Alig, Valentin, von Obersaxen Mundaun, in Obersaxen Mundaun, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Sax, Paul, von Obersaxen Mundaun, in Obersaxen Mundaun, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Sax, Ernst, von Obersaxen Mundaun, in Obersaxen Mundaun, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 2658771, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Bergbahnen Obersaxen AG, in Obersaxen Mundaun, CHE-108.084.219, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 118 vom 23.06.2015, Publ. 2222971).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Brunner, Josef, von Domat/Ems, in Ilanz (Ilanz/Glion), Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Ilanz, Präsident mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Alig, Valentin, von Obersaxen Mundaun, in Obersaxen Mundaun, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: von Obersaxen, in Obersaxen];
Caduff, Sigisbert, von Lumnezia, in Obersaxen Mundaun, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: von Degen, in Obersaxen];
Sax, Norbert, von Obersaxen Mundaun, in Obersaxen Mundaun, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: von und in Obersaxen, in und in Obersaxen];
Sax, Paul, von Obersaxen Mundaun, in Obersaxen Mundaun, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: von Obersaxen, in Obersaxen];
TNC Treuhand Norbert Cavegn AG (CHE-450.125.309), in Lumnezia, Revisionsstelle [bisher: TNC Treuhand Norbert Cavegn AG (CH-350.9.000.740-2)].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.