Reports for Behrend Gebäudetechnik AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Behrend Gebäudetechnik AG
- Behrend Gebäudetechnik AG has its legal headquarters in Basel, is active and operates in the sector «Other construction».
- The management has 3 active persons registered.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 20.12.2022.
- The company is registered in the commercial register BS under the UID CHE-105.207.804.
Management (3)
newest board members
Giuseppe Dimase,
Gabriela Lopez Pantaleon,
Jovanka Inderbitzin-Jauch
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Giuseppe Dimase,
Gabriela Lopez Pantaleon,
Jovanka Inderbitzin-Jauch
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
30.08.1999
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Basel
Commercial Registry Office
BS
Commercial register number
CH-270.3.012.332-8
UID/VAT
CHE-105.207.804
Sector
Other construction
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Ausführung von Heizungs- und Lüftungsinstallationen und Rohrleitungsbau. Die Gesellschaft kann alle Transaktionen des Mobilien- und Immobilienverkehrs vornehmen sowie sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Copartner Revision AG | Basel | 17.11.2004 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Balfidor Fondsleitung AG | Basel | <2004 | 16.11.2004 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Behrend AG, Heizungen und Lüftungen
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Behrend Gebäudetechnik AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005633184, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Behrend Gebäudetechnik AG, in Basel, CHE-105.207.804, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 127 vom 04.07.2019, Publ. 1004667697).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Ricci, Claudio, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Aesch (BL), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Dimase, Giuseppe, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Laufenburg, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Murg (DE), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1004667697, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Behrend Gebäudetechnik AG, in Basel, CHE-105.207.804, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 90 vom 11.05.2018, Publ. 4223573).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Suter, Martin, von Pratteln, in Pratteln, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 4223573, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Behrend Gebäudetechnik AG, in Basel, CHE-105.207.804, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 91 vom 11.05.2017, Publ. 3515649).
Domizil neu:
Eimeldingerweg 43, 4057 Basel.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Behrend, Ralf, von Arlesheim, in Reinach (BL), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Behrend, Uwe, von Arlesheim, in Basel, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Behrend, Franziska, von Arlesheim, in Reinach (BL), mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Dimase, Giuseppe, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Murg (DE), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Inderbitzin, Jovanka, von Steinen, in Allschwil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Lopez Pantaleon, Gabriela, von Delémont, in Basel, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Ricci, Claudio, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Aesch (BL), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien];
Copartner Revision AG (CHE-107.423.224), in Basel, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Copartner Revision AG].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.