Reports for Bauingenieure Haller & Partner AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Bauingenieure Haller & Partner AG
- Bauingenieure Haller & Partner AG is currently active and the industry «Architectural and engineering activities». The legal headquarters are in Oberwil BL.
- There are 5 active persons registered in the management.
- On the 06.08.2024 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-165.858.276.
- There are 2 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: U-Sana Medical AG, Valérie Szabo.
Management (5)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Christophe Haller,
Lea Haller,
Urs Peter Furger,
Felix Schneider,
Tin Tokic
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
05.05.2021
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Oberwil (BL)
Commercial Registry Office
BL
Commercial register number
CH-280.3.025.869-6
UID/VAT
CHE-165.858.276
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Führung eines Ingenieurbüros für Hoch-, Tief- und Brückenbau. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Basel | 06.08.2024 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BANDO TREUHAND AG | Basel | 10.05.2021 | 05.08.2024 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Bauingenieure Haller & Partner AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006100910, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Bauingenieure Haller & Partner AG, in Oberwil (BL), CHE-165.858.276, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 89 vom 09.05.2023, Publ. 1005741812).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
BANDO TREUHAND AG (CHE-109.402.055), in Ettingen, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Haller, Christophe, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Bottmingen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Basel];
Haller, Lea, von Rüderswil, in Bottmingen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Basel];
BDO AG (CHE-370.772.724), in Basel, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005741812, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Bauingenieure Haller & Partner AG, in Oberwil (BL), CHE-165.858.276, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 89 vom 10.05.2021, Publ. 1005175371).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Haller, Lea, von Rüderswil, in Basel, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Kipfer, Lea, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung].
Publication number: HR01-1005175371, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Bauingenieure Haller & Partner AG, in Oberwil (BL), CHE-165.858.276, Hohlegasse 4, 4104 Oberwil BL, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
29.04.2021.
Zweck:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Führung eines Ingenieurbüros für Hoch-, Tief- und Brückenbau. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Aktien:
100 vinkulierte Namenaktien zu CHF 100.00 (Stimmrechtsaktien) und 90 vinkulierte Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00 (Stammaktien).
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen schriftlich per Post oder per E-Mail, sofern und soweit die Adressen bekannt sind, ansonsten via Publikationsorgan.
Vinkulierung:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt.
Eingetragene Personen:
Haller, Christophe, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Basel, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Furger, Urs Peter, von Vals, in Reinach (BL), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Kipfer, Lea, von Rüderswil, in Basel, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
BANDO TREUHAND AG (CHE-109.402.055), in Ettingen, Revisionsstelle;
Schneider, Felix, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Efringen-Kirchen (DE), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Tokic, Tin, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Kingersheim (FR), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.