Reports for Bärenmatten Immobilien AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Bärenmatten Immobilien AG
- Bärenmatten Immobilien AG is active in the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Hölstein.
- The management has 4 active persons registered.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 19.07.2023.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of BL is CHE-211.650.893.
Management (4)
newest board members
Robert Alexander Rüdiger von Rosen,
Judith Stohler,
Sina Stohler
newest authorized signatories
Robert Alexander Rüdiger von Rosen,
Judith Stohler,
Sina Stohler,
Markus Spiess
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
13.03.2018
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Hölstein
Commercial Registry Office
BL
Commercial register number
CH-280.3.022.160-1
UID/VAT
CHE-211.650.893
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Erwerb, die Veräusserung, die Erstellung, die Promotion und die Verwaltung von Immobilien. Die Geselllschaft kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen sowie andere Unternehmen erwerben oder erworbene Unternehmen verkaufen. Sie kann Liegenschaften und Wertschriften erwerben, verwalten und verkaufen. Sie kann alle kommerziellen und finanziellen Transaktionen durchführen, die der Verwirklichung ihres Zwecks förderlich sein könnten. Sie kann Darlehen aufnehmen und gewähren, Garantien und andere Sicherheiten stellen, Immaterialgüterrechte erwerben, verwalten und verwerten.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Bärenmatten Immobilien AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005799112, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Bärenmatten Immobilien AG, in Hölstein, CHE-211.650.893, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 40 vom 27.02.2023, Publ. 1005688110).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Perroulaz, Patrik, von Plaffeien, in Hofstetten-Flüh, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
von Rosen, Robert, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Basel, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005688110, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Bärenmatten Immobilien AG, in Hölstein, CHE-211.650.893, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 122 vom 27.06.2022, Publ. 1005505308).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Strecker, Kurt, von Liestal, in Dornach, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Stohler, Judith, von Arboldswil, in Arboldswil, Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Perroulaz, Patrik, von Plaffeien, in Hofstetten-Flüh, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005505308, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Bärenmatten Immobilien AG, in Hölstein, CHE-211.650.893, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 120 vom 24.06.2020, Publ. 1004918934).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Stohler, Dominik, von Arboldswil, in Arboldswil, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Strecker, Kurt, von Liestal, in Dornach, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Stohler, Sina, von Arboldswil, in Hölstein, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.