Reports for Bachofen Holding AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Bachofen Holding AG
- Bachofen Holding AG from Uster operates in the sector «Operation of investment companies» and is active.
- The management has 5 active persons registered.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 17.06.2024. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The company Bachofen Holding AG is registered under the UID CHE-102.549.616.
- Bachofen AG, Bachofen Immobilien AG, DABA Holding AG have the same address as Bachofen Holding AG.
Management (5)
newest board members
Prof. Dr. Thomas August Gutzwiller,
Ulrich Jakob Looser-Thellung,
Tamer Nasr Talaat,
Daniel Peter Bachofen
newest authorized signatories
Prof. Dr. Thomas August Gutzwiller,
Ulrich Jakob Looser-Thellung,
Tamer Nasr Talaat,
Markus Helm,
Daniel Peter Bachofen
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
21.05.1973
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Uster
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.902.573-4
UID/VAT
CHE-102.549.616
Sector
Operation of investment companies
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erwerb, Verwaltung und Veräusserung von Beteiligungen an Unternehmungen aller Art und deren Finanzierung sowie Durchführung aller damit zusammenhängenden Transaktionen; kann Grundstücke erwerben, halten und veräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
OBT AG | Zürich | 02.02.2016 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Zürich | <2004 | 01.02.2016 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Bachofen Holding SA
- Bachofen Holding Ltd
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Bachofen Holding AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006057998, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Bachofen Holding AG, in Uster, CHE-102.549.616, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 206 vom 24.10.2022, Publ. 1005588890).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Fellinger, Kathrin, von Küsnacht (ZH), in Zumikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005588890, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Bachofen Holding AG, in Uster, CHE-102.549.616, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 60 vom 26.03.2021, Publ. 1005134038).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Helm, Markus, von Zürich, in Stäfa, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Küsnacht (ZH)].
Publication number: HR02-1005134038, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Bachofen Holding AG, in Uster, CHE-102.549.616, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 42 vom 02.03.2020, Publ. 1004841875).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Fischer, Urs T., von Pfeffingen, in Pfeffingen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gutzwiller, Thomas, von Therwil, in St. Gallen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.