Address
c/o Dr. Nathan Labhart IT Services
Stiglenstrasse 31/2
8052 Zürich
Reports for azbi GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout azbi GmbH
- azbi GmbH with its legal headquarters in Zürich is a Limited liability company from the sector «Services regarding management consulting». azbi GmbH is active.
- The management consists of one person. The company was founded on 17.12.2015.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 20.05.2022. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The company azbi GmbH is registered under the UID CHE-472.237.052.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
17.12.2015
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.4.057.271-1
UID/VAT
CHE-472.237.052
Sector
Services regarding management consulting
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Erbringung von Beratungsdienstleistungen, insbesondere im Bereich Unternehmensberatung; Design, Herstellung, Investition und Handel von und mit Waren aller Art, insbesondere von und mit Wohnaccessoires. Die Gesellschaft kann im in- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen oder solche übernehmen sowie alles vorkehren, was ihrem Zwecke dient. Sie kann im In- und Ausland Liegenschaften und Grundstücke erwerben, verwalten und veräussern.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: azbi GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005478269, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
azbi GmbH, in Zürich, CHE-472.237.052, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 52 vom 15.03.2018, Publ. 4113597).
Domizil neu:
c/o Dr. Nathan Labhart IT Services, Stiglenstrasse 31/2, 8052 Zürich.
Publication number: 4113597, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
azbi GmbH, in Zürich, CHE-472.237.052, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 248 vom 22.12.2015, Publ. 2555113).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Rubio Sanchez, Sandra, spanische Staatsangehörige, in Maur, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 1'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Zbinden, Andreas Paul, von Guggisberg, in Zürich, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 19 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00].
Publication number: 2555113, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
azbi GmbH, in Zürich, CHE-472.237.052, Schärenmoosstrasse 11, 8052 Zürich, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
11.12.2015.
Zweck:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Erbringung von Beratungsdienstleistungen, insbesondere im Bereich Unternehmensberatung;
Design, Herstellung, Investition und Handel von und mit Waren aller Art, insbesondere von und mit Wohnaccessoires. Die Gesellschaft kann im in- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen oder solche übernehmen sowie alles vorkehren, was ihrem Zwecke dient. Sie kann im In- und Ausland Liegenschaften und Grundstücke erwerben, verwalten und veräussern.
Stammkapital:
CHF 20'000.00. Nebenleistungspflichten, Vorhand-, Vorkaufs- oder Kaufsrechte gemäss näherer Umschreibung in den Statuten.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Die Mitteilungen der Geschäftsführung an die Gesellschafter erfolgen schriftlich oder per E-Mail. Gemäss Erklärung vom 11.12.2015 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Eingetragene Personen:
Zbinden, Andreas Paul, von Guggisberg, in Zürich, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 19 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00;
Rubio Sanchez, Sandra, spanische Staatsangehörige, in Maur, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 1'000.00.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.