Reports for Auto AG Burgdorf
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Auto AG Burgdorf
- Auto AG Burgdorf is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Burgdorf. Auto AG Burgdorf belongs to the industry «Dealing and repair of automobiles and motorcycles» and is currently active.
- There are 2 active persons registered in the management.
- On the 23.05.2023 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- In the commercial register the company Auto AG Burgdorf is registered under the UID CHE-107.182.977.
- There are 2 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: Immo Emmental AG, Koch Holding AG Burgdorf.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
13.05.1969
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Burgdorf
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-053.3.002.205-4
UID/VAT
CHE-107.182.977
Sector
Dealing and repair of automobiles and motorcycles
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Betrieb einer Autogarage mit Service- und Reparaturwerkstatt, Handel mit Neu- und Gebrauchtwagen, Verkauf von Treibstoffen, Vermietung von Fahrzeugen sowie Ersatzteilhandel. Kann Grundstücke erwerben und verkaufen. Ein allfälliger Nebenzweck ist aus den Statuten ersichtlich.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
FIGAS Autogewerbe-Treuhand der Schweiz AG | Köniz | 04.07.2011 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Auto AG Burgdorf
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005751453, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Auto AG Burgdorf, in Burgdorf, CHE-107.182.977, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 14 vom 20.01.2017, Publ. 3295453). [gestrichen, da nicht zum Eintragungstext gehörend.] [gestrichen: Der von einer bisherigen Registerkarte übertragene Auszug enthält keine vor dem Uebertrag gestrichenen Tatsachen, und auch keine allfälligen früheren Statutendaten oder Tagebuch- und SHAB-Zitate. Diese können auf der im Feld "Uebertrag von" bezeichneten Handelsregisterkarte eingesehen werden.].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Koch, Mario, von Entlebuch, in Burgdorf, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Rüegsauschachen (Rüegsau), Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Koch, Susanna, von Entlebuch, in Bäriswil BE (Bäriswil), mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Koch-Blatter, Susanna].
Publication number: 3295453, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Auto AG Burgdorf, in Burgdorf, CHE-107.182.977, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 146 vom 31.07.2014, Publ. 1642665).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Koch-Blatter, Susanna, von Entlebuch, in Bäriswil BE (Bäriswil), mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Koch-Zutter, Susanna].
Publication number: 1642665, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Auto AG Burgdorf, in Burgdorf, CHE-107.182.977, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 127 vom 04.07.2011, Publ. 6233922).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Zaugg, Maurice, von Wyssachen, in Burgdorf, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Gutknecht, Benjamin, von Thalheim an der Thur, in Burgdorf, Mitglied und Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Zaugg, Dominic, von Wyssachen, in Burgdorf, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Zaugg, Roger, von Wyssachen, in Burgdorf, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Gerber, Thomas, von Aarwangen, in Burgdorf, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Gutknecht, Danielle, von Thalheim an der Thur, in Burgdorf, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Koch, Mario, von Entlebuch, in Rüegsauschachen (Rüegsau), Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Koch-Zutter, Susanna, von Entlebuch, in Bäriswil, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Figas Autogewerbe-Treuhand der Schweiz AG (CHE-113.339.187), in Köniz, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Figas Autogewerbe-Treuhand der Schweiz AG (CH-035.3.036.871-6)].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.