Address
c/o Peter Walder
Brunnenzelgstrasse 6
8904 Aesch ZH
Reports for ALMENO Immobilien AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout ALMENO Immobilien AG
- ALMENO Immobilien AG with its legal headquarters in Aesch ZH is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties». ALMENO Immobilien AG is active.
- The management consists of 2 persons. The company was founded on 02.03.2011.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 04.09.2018. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The company ALMENO Immobilien AG is registered under the UID CHE-411.588.261.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
02.03.2011
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Aesch (ZH)
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.036.267-7
UID/VAT
CHE-411.588.261
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Erwerb und den Verkauf (Handel), die Vermietung und Verwaltung und die Finanzierung von Liegenschaften im In- und Ausland sowie die Erbringung sämtlicher Dienstleistungen, die im Zusammenhang mit dem Handel oder der Bewirtschaftung oder Finanzierung von in- und ausländischen Immobilien im Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann eigene oder fremde Immobilienprojekte realisieren, Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- ALMENO Immobilien SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: ALMENO Immobilien AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-0004448070, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
ALMENO Immobilien AG, in Aesch (ZH), CHE-411.588.261, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 73 vom 17.04.2018, Publ. 4174721).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Walder, Reto, von Männedorf, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 4174721, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
ALMENO Immobilien AG, in Unterengstringen, CHE-411.588.261, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 50 vom 13.03.2018, Publ. 4107297).
Statutenänderung:
05.04.2018.
Uebersetzungen der Firma neu:
(ALMENO Immobilien SA).
Sitz neu:
Aesch (ZH).
Domizil neu:
c/o Peter Walder, Brunnenzelgstrasse 6, 8904 Aesch ZH.
Aktien neu:
300 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: 300 Inhaberaktien zu CHF 1'000.00].
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen durch Brief an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen.
Vinkulierung neu:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt.
Publication number: 4107297, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
ALMENO Immobilien AG, in Unterengstringen, CHE-411.588.261, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 127 vom 04.07.2017, Publ. 3619849).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Walder, René, von Männedorf, in Unterengstringen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Walder, Bruno, von Männedorf, in Schöfflisdorf, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Walder Harbeke, Peter, von Männedorf, in Aesch (ZH), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Walder, Reto, von Männedorf, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.