Branches (1)
Reports for Elsener Klima AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Elsener Klima AG
- Elsener Klima AG in Adliswil is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Architectural and engineering activities». Elsener Klima AG is active.
- The management consists of 2 persons. The company was founded on 31.07.1998.
- The last commercial register change was made on 23.04.2024. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The company Elsener Klima AG is registered under the UID CHE-102.755.972.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
31.07.1998
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Adliswil
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-170.3.022.267-2
UID/VAT
CHE-102.755.972
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Projektierung, Ausführung und Montage von luft-, heiz- und kältetechnischen Einrichtungen. Die Gesellschaft kann sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen sowie Grundstücke und Immaterialgüterrechte erwerben, verwerten, verwalten und veräussern, Tochtergesellschaften und Zweigniederlassungen im In- und Ausland errichten und ausserdem alle Rechtshandlungen vornehmen, die der Zweck der Gesellschaft mit sich bringen kann oder die geeignet sind, ihre Entwicklung oder diejenige von Gruppengesellschaften zu fördern. Des Weiteren kann die Gesellschaft direkt oder indirekt an Konzernfinanzierungen teilnehmen, insbesondere indem sie ihren direkten oder indirekten Gesellschaftern oder anderen Gruppengesellschaften Kredite gewährt oder für deren Verbindlichkeiten gegenüber Dritten Garantien, Bürgschaften oder andere Sicherheiten aller Art gewährt, auch wenn diese Kredite oder Sicherheiten im ausschliesslichen Interesse ihrer direkten oder indirekten Gesellschafter oder anderer Gruppengesellschaften liegen und unentgeltlich gewährt werden.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
KPMG AG | Zürich | 21.07.2023 |
Former auditor (4)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Aarau | 20.09.2017 | 20.07.2023 | |
Meier & Partner AG, Baar | Baar | 27.07.2016 | 19.09.2017 | |
MeiTreu und Partner AG | Eggenwil | 02.03.2012 | 26.07.2016 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Albis Technik AG
- Kuhn International Holding AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Elsener Klima AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006015069, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Albis Technik AG, in Adliswil, CHE-102.755.972, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 140 vom 21.07.2023, Publ. 1005800792).
Statutenänderung:
22.03.2024.
Fusion:
Übernahme der Aktiven und Passiven der Elsener-Klima AG, in Adliswil (CHE-106.938.690), gemäss Fusionsvertrag vom 22.03.2024 und Bilanz per 31.12.2023. Aktiven von CHF 1'932'453.00 und Passiven (Fremdkapital) von CHF 3'094'458.00, d.h. ein Passivenüberschuss von CHF 1'162'005.00, gehen auf die übernehmende Gesellschaft über. Gemäss Bestätigung des zugelassenen Revisionsexperten liegen Rangrücktrittserklärungen im Umfang der Unterdeckung und der Überschuldung der übertragenden Gesellschaft vor. Da die übernehmende Gesellschaft sämtliche Aktien der übertragenden Gesellschaft hält, findet weder eine Kapitalerhöhung noch eine Aktienzuteilung statt.
Firma neu:
Elsener Klima AG.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen per Brief oder E-Mail an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Arnold, Christoph, von Unterschächen, in Beamsville (CA), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Rutz, Barbara, von Niederlenz, in Embrach, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Weiss, Andreas, von Aeugst am Albis, in Mettmenstetten, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Böhm, Zeno, von Risch, in Risch, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.