Address
Breitenstrasse 59
8832 Wilen b. Wollerau
Reports for AGIN AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout AGIN AG
- AGIN AG is currently active and the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties». The legal headquarters are in Wilen b. Wollerau.
- The management of the company AGIN AG consists of 2 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 13.09.1961.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 21.05.2015.
- The company is registered in the commercial register SZ under the UID CHE-100.620.315.
- Companies with the same address as AGIN AG: Hannelore Zweifel-Stiftung, Spetzmann AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
13.09.1961
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Freienbach
Commercial Registry Office
SZ
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.900.439-4
UID/VAT
CHE-100.620.315
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erbringung von Verwaltungsdienstleistungen im Immobilienbereich sowie Erwerb, Verkauf und Verwaltung von Beteiligungen an anderen Unternehmen jeder Art; kann Grundeigentum erwerben, vermieten, belasten, überbauen und veräussern, Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen; kann gewerbliche Schutzrechte, Lizenzen und Konzessionen erwerben, darüber verfügen, auswerten, vermarkten und verwerten.
Other company names
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: AGIN AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 2163193, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
AGIN AG, in Freienbach, CHE-100.620.315, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 76 vom 21.04.2010, S. 13, Publ. 5596884).
Domizil neu:
Breitenstrasse 59, 8832 Wilen SZ.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Zweifel, Hannelore, von Netstal, in Pfäffikon SZ, Präsidentin, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Zweifel, Gilg, von Glarus, in Freienbach, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 5596884, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
AGIN AG, in Freienbach, CH-020.3.900.439-4, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 249 vom 22.12.2005, S. 16, Publ. 3160692).
Statutenänderung:
26.03.2010.
Zweck neu:
Erbringung von Verwaltungsdienstleistungen im Immobilienbereich sowie Erwerb, Verkauf und Verwaltung von Beteiligungen an anderen Unternehmen jeder Art;
kann Grundeigentum erwerben, vermieten, belasten, überbauen und veräussern, Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen;
kann gewerbliche Schutzrechte, Lizenzen und Konzessionen erwerben, darüber verfügen, auswerten, vermarkten und verwerten.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre durch Brief, Telefax oder E-Mail. [Weitere Statutenänderungen sind nicht publikationspflichtig.]. Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 26.3.2010 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Speich-Maduz, Hans, von Glarus und Matt, in Glarus, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Zweifel, Hannelore, von Netstal, in Pfäffikon SZ, Präsidentin, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied];
Stierli, Dr. Bruno, von Aristau, in Uetikon am See, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 3186470, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Agin AG, in Wald ZH, CH-020.3.900.439-4, Fabrikation und Vertrieb von Tanksicherungen, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 148 vom 02.08.1996, S. 4619). Die Gesellschaft (neu: AGIN AG) wird infolge Verlegung des Sitzes nach Freienbach (SHAB Nr. 249 vom 22.12.2005, S. 16) im Handelsregister des Kantons Zürich von Amtes wegen gelöscht.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.