Addressc/o BioArk SARoute de l'Ile-au-Bois 1A 1870 Monthey |
Unlock additional contact details such as phone, website or email address |
About
aeChem Life Technologies Sàrl
- aeChem Life Technologies Sàrl with its legal headquarters in Monthey is a Limited liability company from the sector «Production of chemical products». aeChem Life Technologies Sàrl is active.
- The company was founded on 24.07.2018 and has one person in its management.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 28.06.2024.
- In the commercial register the company aeChem Life Technologies Sàrl is registered under the UID CHE-235.982.601.
- Next to the company aeChem Life Technologies Sàrl there are 15 other active companies with an identical address. These include: Artelia Industrie Suisse SA, ASSCO Engineering Monthey SA, Avogen Tech SA.
ManagementSource: SOGC |
Executive board |
newest authorized signatories |
Network
View network in detail
Informationen aus dem HandelsregisterSource: SOGC |
|
Entry in the commercial register24.07.2018 |
|
Legal formLimited liability company |
|
Legal headquarters of the companyMonthey |
Commercial Registry OfficeVS |
Commercial register numberCH-621.4.010.267-1 |
|
UID/VATCHE-235.982.601 |
|
SectorProduction of chemical products |
|
Purpose (Original language)Recherche, développement, fabrication, représentation et commercialisation de solutions technologiques de chimie ainsi que de systèmes de diagnostic de haute précision dans le domaine de la médecine personnalisée et des biotechnologies ainsi que toutes prestations de services dans ces domaines. |
Other company namesSource: SOGC |
|
Past and translated company names
|
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: aeChem Life Technologies Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006070595, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
aeChem Life Technologies Sàrl, à Monthey, CHE-235.982.601, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 131 du 09.07.2020, Publ. 1004933544).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Condemi, Enrico Antonino, de Delémont, à Lausanne, associé et gérant, avec signature collective à deux, pour 212 parts sociales de CHF 100.00;
Prim, Denis Alexandre, de Guggisberg, à Ayent, associé, sans droit de signature, pour 40 parts sociales de CHF 100.00.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Kandaswamy, Djano, citoyen belge, à Ayent, associé et gérant, avec signature individuelle, pour 400 parts sociales de CHF 100.00 [précédemment: associé et président des gérants, avec signature collective à deux, pour 148 parts sociales de CHF 100.00].
Publication number: HR02-1004933544, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
aeChem Life Technologies Sàrl, à Monthey, CHE-235.982.601, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 203 du 21.10.2019, Publ. 1004741950).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Revaz, Bernard, de Vernayaz, à Genève, associé et président des gérants, avec signature collective à deux, pour 20 parts sociales de CHF 100.00;
Baud, Vincent, de Nendaz, à Ardon, associé et gérant, avec signature collective à deux, pour 20 parts sociales de CHF 100.00.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Kandaswamy, Djano, citoyen belge, à Ayent, associé et président des gérants, avec signature collective à deux, pour 148 parts sociales de CHF 100.00 [précédemment: associé et gérant, avec signature collective à deux, pour 108 parts sociales de CHF 100.00].
Publication number: HR02-1004741950, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
aeChem Sàrl, à Monthey, CHE-235.982.601, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 201 du 17.10.2019, Publ. 1004740044).
Modification des statuts:
20.09.2019.
Nouvelle raison sociale:
aeChem Life Technologies Sàrl.
Nouveau but:
recherche, développement, fabrication, représentation et commercialisation de solutions technologiques de chimie ainsi que de systèmes de diagnostic de haute précision dans le domaine de la médecine personnalisée et des biotechnologies ainsi que toutes prestations de services dans ces domaines.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Revaz, Bernard, de Vernayaz, à Genève, associé et président des gérants, avec signature collective à deux, pour 20 parts sociales de CHF 100.00 [précédemment: associé, sans droit de signature, pour 50 parts sociales de CHF 100.00];
Baud, Vincent, de Nendaz, à Ardon, associé et gérant, avec signature collective à deux, pour 20 parts sociales de CHF 100.00 [précédemment: associé, sans droit de signature, pour 50 parts sociales de CHF 100.00];
Condemi, Enrico Antonino, de Delémont, à Lausanne, associé et gérant, avec signature collective à deux, pour 212 parts sociales de CHF 100.00 [précédemment: pour 100 parts sociales de CHF 100.00];
Kandaswamy, Djano, citoyen belge, à Ayent, associé et gérant, avec signature collective à deux, pour 108 parts sociales de CHF 100.00 [précédemment: associé, sans droit de signature, pour 100 parts sociales de CHF 100.00];
Prim, Denis Alexandre, de Guggisberg, à Ayent, associé, sans droit de signature, pour 40 parts sociales de CHF 100.00 [précédemment: associé et président des gérants, avec signature collective à deux, pour 100 parts sociales de CHF 100.00].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.