Reports for 4 seasons transfers Sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout 4 seasons transfers Sàrl
- 4 seasons transfers Sàrl with its legal headquarters in Lully VD is a Limited liability company from the sector «Transportation of passenger and freight by road». 4 seasons transfers Sàrl is active.
- There is one active person registered in the management.
- The last commercial register change was made on 23.08.2023. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company 4 seasons transfers Sàrl is the following: CHE-392.594.313.
- Companies with the same address as 4 seasons transfers Sàrl: 2Clean LC Sàrl, 2Clean Management Sàrl.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.10.2022
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Lully (VD)
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.215.434-3
UID/VAT
CHE-392.594.313
Sector
Transportation of passenger and freight by road
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour but le transport professionnel de personnes. La société peut créer des succursales en Suisse et à l'étranger, participer à d'autres entreprises en Suisse et à l'étranger, acquérir ou créer des entreprises similaires ou apparentées, accorder des prêts ou des garanties à des associés ou à des tiers ainsi que conclure toutes les affaires et tous les contrats qui sont de nature à promouvoir le but de la société ou qui ont un rapport direct ou indirect avec celui-ci.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: 4 seasons transfers Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005822387, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
4 seasons transfers Sàrl, à Yens, CHE-392.594.313 (FOSC du 19.12.2022, p. 0/1005632360). Statuts modifiés le 10.08.2023. Siège transféré à Lully (VD).
Nouvelle adresse:
Chemin de Préveyres 57e, 1132 Lully VD.
Publication number: HR02-1005632360, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
4 seasons transfers Sàrl, à Yens, CHE-392.594.313 (FOSC du 02.11.2022, p. 0/1005595990). Parreaux Mathieu, qui n'est plus associé-gérant et dont la signature est radiée, cède ses 160 parts de CHF 100 à l'associé-gérant Velentzas Efstathios, qui n'est plus président, désormais titulaire de 200 parts de CHF 100.
Publication number: HR01-1005595990, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
4 seasons transfers Sàrl, à Yens, Place de la Cité 3, 1169 Yens, CHE-392.594.313. Nouvelle société à responsabilité limitée.
Statuts:
18.10.2022.
But:
la société a pour but le transport professionnel de personnes. La société peut créer des succursales en Suisse et à l'étranger, participer à d'autres entreprises en Suisse et à l'étranger, acquérir ou créer des entreprises similaires ou apparentées, accorder des prêts ou des garanties à des associés ou à des tiers ainsi que conclure toutes les affaires et tous les contrats qui sont de nature à promouvoir le but de la société ou qui ont un rapport direct ou indirect avec celui-ci.
Obligation de fournir des prestations accessoires, droits de préférence, de préemption ou d'emption:
pour les détails, voir les statuts.
Capital social:
CHF 20'000.
Associés-gérants avec signature individuelle:
Velentzas Efstathios, de Grèce, à Yens, avec 40 parts de CHF 100, président, et Parreaux Mathieu, de La Brévine, à Le Grand-Saconnex, avec 160 parts de CHF 100.
Organe de publication:
Feuille officielle suisse du commerce.
Communications aux associés:
par écrit ou par courriel. Selon déclaration du 18.10.2022, la société n'est pas soumise à une révision ordinaire et renonce à une révision restreinte.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.