Christine Zuber
domiciled in Stammheim, from Spiez and Hombrechtikon Active mandates: Olga Mayenfisch Stiftung Connected persons: Kuno Werner Rechsteiner, Urs Christoph Rechsteiner, Marianne Nydegger-Jöhr You can stay up to date through "Christine Zuber", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christine Zuber"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Christine Zuber", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christine Zuber"
|
|
Christine Zuber
domiciled in Meggen, from Buchs (SG), Sevelen, Fischingen and Wil (SG) Active mandates: Karl Zuber, eidg. dipl. Florist, Flowerevents Connected persons: Karl Zuber You can stay up to date through "Christine Zuber", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christine Zuber"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Christine Zuber", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christine Zuber"
|
Places where people with the name Christine Zuber live
Sectors in which people with the name Christine Zuber work
Religious, political or secular associations
Trading with various goods
Religious, political or secular associations
Trading with various goods
Private persons with the name Christine Zuber
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Christine Zuber
Publication number: HR02-1005013416, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Olga Mayenfisch Stiftung, in Zürich, CHE-102.058.608, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 137 vom 18.07.2014, S.0, Publ. 1621819).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rechsteiner, Urs, von Appenzell und Zürich, in Maur, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Zürich];
Zuber, Christine, von Spiez und Hombrechtikon, in Stammheim, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Waltalingen, Geschäftsführerin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Rechsteiner, Dr. Kuno W., von Zürich, in Zürich, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Rechsteiner, Kuno W., Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: 1868971, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Raiffeisenbank Adligenswil-Udligenswil-Meggen Genossenschaft, in Adligenswil, CHE-107.247.915, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 128 vom 07.07.2014, Publ. 1597367).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Zuber, Christine, von Wil SG, Buchs SG, Sevelen und Fischingen, in Meggen, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Sennhauser, Bruno, von Zürich und Lütisburg, in Beromünster, Vorsitzender der Bankleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Neudorf].
Publication number: 4067020, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Raiffeisenbank Adligenswil-Udligenswil, in Adligenswil, CH-100.5.003.857-8, Die Bank betreibt in gemeinsamer Selbsthilfe im Sinne des genossenschaftlichen Gedankengutes von Friedrich Wilhelm Raiffeisen die Entgegennahme von Geldern in allen bankgemässen Formen,... Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 113 vom 14.06.2007, S. 9, Publ. 3973712).
Statutenänderung:
24.03.2007.
Firma neu:
Raiffeisenbank Adligenswil-Udligenswil Genossenschaft. [Weitere Aenderungen berühren keine publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen.]. [gestrichen: Verwaltungsrat: mindestens drei Mitglieder].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Emch, Sylvia, von Adligenswil und Luzern, in Adligenswil, Aktuarin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied und Aktuarin];
Zuber, Christine, von Wil SG, Buchs SG, Sevelen und Fischingen, in Meggen, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.