Martin Stocker
domiciled in Köniz, from Boltigen Active mandates: Planel AG in Liquidation, ENERCONOM AG and more Connected persons: Rolf Friedrich Moser, Roman Portmann, Sibilla Hess and more You can stay up to date through "Martin Stocker", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Martin Stocker"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Martin Stocker", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Martin Stocker"
|
|
Martin Stocker
domiciled in Ebikon, from Beromünster Active mandates: Ronald McDonald Haus Stiftung Luzern Connected persons: Evelyne Rast, Birgit Wernz, Donald Locher and more You can stay up to date through "Martin Stocker", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Martin Stocker"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Martin Stocker", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Martin Stocker"
|
|
Martin Stocker
domiciled in Birrwil, from Oberrüti Active mandates: SENSE OF LIFE Connected persons: Andres Bär You can stay up to date through "Martin Stocker", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Martin Stocker"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Martin Stocker", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Martin Stocker"
|
Places where people with the name Martin Stocker live
Sectors in which people with the name Martin Stocker work
Architectural and engineering activities
Operation of other financial institutions
Operation of other lodgings/accommodations
Religious, political or secular associations
Architectural and engineering activities
Operation of other financial institutions
Operation of other lodgings/accommodations
Religious, political or secular associations
Private persons with the name Martin Stocker
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Martin Stocker
Publication number: HR02-1006088872, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Velogarage GmbH, in Zürich, CHE-107.611.702, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 251 vom 24.12.2010, S.37, Publ. 5958492).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Stocker, Martin, von Obermumpf, in Zürich, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 19'000.00;
Donzé, André, von Zürich, in Zürich, Gesellschafter, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 1'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Meier, Daniel, von Glarus Süd, in Zürich, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 1'000.00 und mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 19'000.00.
Publication number: HR02-1005899558, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Verein Spitex Zürichsee, in Männedorf, CHE-220.019.073, Verein (SHAB Nr. 196 vom 10.10.2023, Publ. 1005856500).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Stocker, Martin, von Zürich, in Brütten, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Eigenmann, Stefan, von Zürich, in Zollikon, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Hauser, Christine, von Thalwil, in Zürich, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005572480, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Planel AG, in Bern, CHE-100.706.879, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 138 vom 20.07.2020, Publ. 1004940449).
Firma neu:
Planel AG in Liquidation.
Uebersetzungen der Firma neu:
(Planel SA en liquidation) (Planel Ltd. in liquidation).
Vinkulierung neu:
[Die Beschränkung der Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist im Sinne von Art. 685a Abs. 3 OR aufgehoben.]. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 22.09.2022 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Stocker, Martin, von Boltigen, in Köniz, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].