Urs Albrecht Schupp
domiciled in Rüschlikon, from Luzern and Zürich Active mandates: Schupp Verlagsmanagement AG, Schupp Holding AG Connected persons: Simone Cornelia Schupp, Simone Cornelia Schupp You can stay up to date through "Urs Albrecht Schupp", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Urs Albrecht Schupp"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Urs Albrecht Schupp", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Urs Albrecht Schupp"
|
Places where people with the name Urs Albrecht Schupp live
Sectors in which people with the name Urs Albrecht Schupp work
Services regarding management consulting
Operation of other financial institutions
Services regarding management consulting
Operation of other financial institutions
Private persons with the name Urs Albrecht Schupp
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Urs Albrecht Schupp
Publication number: HR02-1004874083, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Nachtblau AG, in Zürich, CHE-330.640.789, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 243 vom 14.12.2018, Publ. 1004520759).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schupp, Urs, von Zürich, in Rüschlikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Rosete ten Pas, Roman, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Berlin (DE), mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ruoss, Thomas, von Schübelbach, in Feusisberg, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1004848297, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Cornelsen Schweiz AG, in Zürich, CHE-109.098.796, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 149 vom 06.08.2019, Publ. 1004690063).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schupp, Urs Albrecht, von Zürich, in Rüschlikon, Geschäftsführer, Sekretär (Nichtmitglied), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Steffens, Tobias, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Berlin (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Vogt, Hans Dieter, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Freiburg (DE), Geschäftsführer, Sekretär (Nichtmitglied), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 4160519, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Schupp Holding AG, bisher in Wollerau, CHE-101.196.171, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 179 vom 17.09.2007, Publ. 4112066).
Statutenänderung:
28.03.2018.
Sitz neu:
Zürich.
Domizil neu:
Alte Feldeggstrasse 14, 8008 Zürich.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schupp, Urs, von Luzern und Zürich, in Zürich, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Rüschlikon].