Keiichiro Otofuji
domiciled in Zürich, from Japan Active mandates: Kuoni Reisen Beteiligungs AG, Kuoni Global Travel Services (Schweiz) AG Connected persons: Daisuke Fujii, Goro Kido, Yasuhisa Fukuta and more You can stay up to date through "Keiichiro Otofuji", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Keiichiro Otofuji"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Keiichiro Otofuji", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Keiichiro Otofuji"
|
Places where people with the name Keiichiro Otofuji live
Sectors in which people with the name Keiichiro Otofuji work
Operation of investment companies
Travel agency and tour operator services
Operation of investment companies
Travel agency and tour operator services
Private persons with the name Keiichiro Otofuji
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Keiichiro Otofuji
Publication number: HR02-1006015134, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Kuoni Reisen Beteiligungs AG, in Zürich, CHE-444.146.295, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 37 vom 22.02.2024, Publ. 1005967704).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Aomi, Tomo, japanischer Staatsangehöriger, in Sapporo City (JP), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kido, Goro, japanischer Staatsangehöriger, in Zürich, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Yokohama (JP)];
Fujii, Daisuke, japanischer Staatsangehöriger, in Chuo-ku (JP), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Otofuji, Keiichiro, japanischer Staatsangehöriger, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1005967704, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Kuoni Reisen Beteiligungs AG, in Zürich, CHE-444.146.295, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 44 vom 03.03.2023, Publ. 1005691964).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kamio, Shinji, japanischer Staatsangehöriger, in Zürich, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kido, Goro, japanischer Staatsangehöriger, in Yokohama (JP), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Fukuta, Yasuhisa, japanischer Staatsangehöriger, in Osaka (JP), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Otofuji, Keiichiro, japanischer Staatsangehöriger, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005104012, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Berichtigung des im SHAB Nr. 7 vom 12.01.2021 publizierten TR-Eintrags Nr. 1107 vom 07.01.2021 Kuoni Global Travel Services (Schweiz) AG, in Zürich, CHE-263.188.235, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 7 vom 12.01.2021, Publ. 1005070990).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Otofuji, Keiichiro, japanischer Staatsangehöriger, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [nicht: in Chiba (JP)].