Tina Nüesch-Felber
domiciled in Tinizong, from Emmen Active mandates: Nüesch Partner Entwicklungen AG, Tina Felber GmbH in Liquidation and more Connected persons: Urs Nüesch-Felber You can stay up to date through "Tina Nüesch-Felber", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Tina Nüesch-Felber"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Tina Nüesch-Felber", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Tina Nüesch-Felber"
|
Places where people with the name Tina Nüesch-Felber live
Sectors in which people with the name Tina Nüesch-Felber work
Architectural and engineering activities
Services regarding public relations
Operation of hotels, inns and B&B/guesthouses
Architectural and engineering activities
Services regarding public relations
Operation of hotels, inns and B&B/guesthouses
Private persons with the name Tina Nüesch-Felber
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Tina Nüesch-Felber
Publication number: HR02-1005410461, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Panorama Development AG, in Chur, CHE-355.554.781, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 212 vom 01.11.2019, Publ. 1004750655).
Statutenänderung:
14.02.2022.
Sitz neu:
Surses.
Domizil neu:
c/o Tina Nüesch-Felber, Veia digl Mot 10, 7453 Tinizong.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Eggenberger, Hans Rudolf, genannt Hans-Ruedi, von Grabs, in Chur, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Nüesch-Felber, Tina, von Emmen, in Surses, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 3873539, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Nüesch & Partner Beteiligungen AG, in Surses, CHE-112.691.233, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 216 vom 06.11.2008, Publ. 4721756).
Statutenänderung:
31.10.2017.
Firma neu:
Nüesch Partner Entwicklungen AG.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Nüesch, Urs, von Balgach, in Surses, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Uster, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Nüesch-Felber, Tina, von Emmen, in Surses, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.