Jasmin Meier-Schürch
domiciled in Flaach, from Flaach and Sumiswald Active mandates: APD Auen Pflege Dienst AG Connected persons: Anton Meier You can stay up to date through "Jasmin Meier-Schürch", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Jasmin Meier-Schürch"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Jasmin Meier-Schürch", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Jasmin Meier-Schürch"
|
Places where people with the name Jasmin Meier-Schürch live
Sectors in which people with the name Jasmin Meier-Schürch work
Gardening and landscaping
Gardening and landscaping
Private persons with the name Jasmin Meier-Schürch
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Jasmin Meier-Schürch
Publication number: HR02-1005806921, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
APD Auen Pflege Dienst AG, in Flaach, CHE-113.597.252, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 94 vom 15.05.2020, Publ. 1004890159).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Breiter, Barbara, von Flaach und Neunkirch, in Flaach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Breiter, Hanspeter, von Flaach, in Flaach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Meier-Schürch, Jasmin, von Flaach und Sumiswald, in Flaach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005654769, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Naturenergie und Handels AG, in Flaach, CHE-112.890.413, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 79 vom 25.04.2006, S.17, Publ. 3348208). Gemäss Erklärung vom 30.11.2022 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Meier, Anton, von Flaach, in Flaach, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Meier-Schürch, Jasmin, von Flaach und Sumiswald, in Flaach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Peter-Kaiser, Karin, von Trüllikon und Grellingen, in Kleinandelfingen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Hübscher, Martin, von Wattenwil, in Gachnang, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Störchli, Ramon, von Münchwilen (TG), in Schaffhausen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1004890159, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
APD Auen Pflege Dienst AG, in Flaach, CHE-113.597.252, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 85 vom 04.05.2020, Publ. 1004881794).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Meier-Schürch, Jasmin, von Flaach und Sumiswald, in Flaach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.