Hans-Ulrich Maurer
domiciled in Muhen, from Muhen Active mandates: Milchgenossenschaft Muhen Connected persons: Jürg Lüscher, Ulrich Matter, Hans Ulrich Lüscher-Röthlisberger and more You can stay up to date through "Hans-Ulrich Maurer", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Hans-Ulrich Maurer"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Hans-Ulrich Maurer", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Hans-Ulrich Maurer"
|
Places where people with the name Hans-Ulrich Maurer live
Sectors in which people with the name Hans-Ulrich Maurer work
Production of comestibles
Production of comestibles
Private persons with the name Hans-Ulrich Maurer
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Hans-Ulrich Maurer
Publication number: HR02-1005042777, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
MCC Maurer Creative Concepts AG, in Zollikon, CHE-103.933.897, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 198 vom 14.10.2014, S.0, Publ. 1767267).
Firma neu:
MCC Maurer Creative Concepts AG in Liquidation.
Vinkulierung neu:
[Die Beschränkung der Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist im Sinne von Art. 685a Abs. 3 OR aufgehoben.]. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 25.11.2020 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Maurer, Hans Ulrich, von Zollikon, in Zollikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1004511673, Commercial Registry Office Nidwalden, (150)
Holzbau Kayser AG, in Oberdorf (NW), CHE-101.418.331, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 231 vom 28.11.2017, Publ. 3896097).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Maurer, Hans Ulrich, von Vechigen, in Ennetbürgen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 2770809, Commercial Registry Office Nidwalden, (150)
Holzbau Kayser AG, in Oberdorf (NW), CHE-101.418.331, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 181 vom 19.09.2014, Publ. 1723197).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Furrer, Anton, von Lungern, in Alpnach, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Kneubühler, Hansjörg, von Hildisrieden, in Giswil, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Meier, Esther, von Knutwil, in Weggis, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Maurer, Hans Ulrich, von Vechigen, in Ennetbürgen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.