Paola Masoni D'Andrea
domiciled in Lugano, from Lugano Active mandates: Fondazione Ferdinando e Laura Pica-Alfieri, Magazzini Generali con Punto Franco SA and more Connected persons: Marina Paola Francesca Masoni Pelloni, Luciano Giudici, Luigi Artemio Mattei and more You can stay up to date through "Paola Masoni D'Andrea", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Paola Masoni D'Andrea"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Paola Masoni D'Andrea", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Paola Masoni D'Andrea"
|
Places where people with the name Paola Masoni D'Andrea live
Sectors in which people with the name Paola Masoni D'Andrea work
Religious, political or secular associations
Warehousing and logistics
Other social services
Religious, political or secular associations
Warehousing and logistics
Other social services
Private persons with the name Paola Masoni D'Andrea
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Paola Masoni D'Andrea
Publication number: HR02-1005335220, Commercial Registry Office Ticino, (501)
Fondazione Ferdinando e Laura Pica-Alfieri, in Lugano, CHE-110.320.731, fondazione (Nr. FUSC 155 del 12.08.2021, Pubbl. 1005269893).
Nuove persone iscritte o modifiche:
Masoni, Marina, da Lugano e Alto Malcantone, in Lugano, vice-presidente, con firma collettiva a due [finora: da Lugano e Alto Malcantone, membro, con firma collettiva a due con il presidente o il vice-presidente];
Bettina, Walter, cittadina germanica, in Tremona (Mendrisio), segretaria, con firma collettiva a due con il presidente o il vice-presidente;
Masoni D'Andrea, Paola, da Lugano, in Lugano, membro, con firma collettiva a due con il presidente o vice-presidente [finora: membro, segretaria, con firma collettiva a due con il presidente o vice-presidente, con firma collettiva a due con il presidente o vice-presidente].
Publication number: HR02-1004724440, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
L.U.de.S. - Libera Associazione degli Studi di Scienze Umane e Tecnologiche, in Baar, CHE-101.117.987, Verein (SHAB Nr. 93 vom 18.05.2015, S.0, Publ. 2156105).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Masoni, Paola, von Lugano, in Lugano, Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Grandini, Giorgio, von Collina d'Oro, in Lugano, Direktor, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-0004447828, Commercial Registry Office Ticino, (501)
Société Immobilière Vertes Prairies, in Lugano, CHE-100.858.785, società anonima (Nr. FUSC 22 del 01.02.2018, Pubbl. 4030315).
Nuova ragione sociale:
Société Immobilière Vertes Prairies in liquidazione. La società è sciolta con decisione dell'assemblea generale del 24.08.2018.
Nuove persone iscritte o modifiche:
Masoni D'Andrea, Paola, da Lugano, in Lugano, liquidatrice, con firma individuale [finora: Masoni, Paola, membro del consiglio, con firma individuale].