Lutz Bertil Majer
domiciled in Freienbach, from Wädenswil Active mandates: Sitecore Schweiz AG Connected persons: David Larry Reid You can stay up to date through "Lutz Bertil Majer", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Lutz Bertil Majer"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Lutz Bertil Majer", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Lutz Bertil Majer"
|
Places where people with the name Lutz Bertil Majer live
Sectors in which people with the name Lutz Bertil Majer work
IT services
IT services
Private persons with the name Lutz Bertil Majer
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Lutz Bertil Majer
Publication number: HR02-1006137371, Commercial Registry Office Zurich
Sitecore Schweiz AG, in Zürich, CHE-444.316.930, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 58 vom 22.03.2024, Publ. 1005992088).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Majer, Lutz Bertil, von Wädenswil, in Freienbach, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Brun, Esther, von Heiden, in Baden, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005461199, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Berichtigung des im SHAB Nr. 76 vom 20.04.2022 publizierten TR-Eintrags Nr. 15589 vom 13.04.2022 Sitecore Schweiz AG, in Zürich, CHE-444.316.930, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 76 vom 20.04.2022, Publ. 1005453816).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Majer, Lutz Bertil, von Wädenswil, in Freienbach, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [nicht: in Wollerau].
Publication number: HR02-1005453816, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Sitecore Schweiz AG, in Zürich, CHE-444.316.930, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 200 vom 14.10.2021, Publ. 1005312002).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Majer, Lutz Bertil, von Wädenswil, in Wollerau, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Uitikon].