Dr. Anita Kohler
domiciled in Rorschacherberg, from Austria Active mandates: AK Medservice GmbH in Liquidation Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Dr. Anita Kohler", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Dr. Anita Kohler"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Dr. Anita Kohler", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Dr. Anita Kohler"
|
|
Anita Kohler
domiciled in Riken AG, from Roggwil (BE) Active mandates: TIKTAK KOHLER Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Anita Kohler", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Anita Kohler"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Anita Kohler", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Anita Kohler"
|
|
Anita Kohler
domiciled in Solothurn, from Küsnacht (ZH) and Wynau Active mandates: Anita Blumen, Kohler Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Anita Kohler", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Anita Kohler"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Anita Kohler", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Anita Kohler"
|
|
Anita Kohler
domiciled in Enggistein, from Langnau im Emmental Active mandates: AKADEHA Praxis für Psychiatrie und Psychotherapie GmbH in Liquidation Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Anita Kohler", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Anita Kohler"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Anita Kohler", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Anita Kohler"
|
Places where people with the name Anita Kohler live
Sectors in which people with the name Anita Kohler work
Operation of general healthcare facilities
Agriculture (various)
Trading with various goods
Operation of general healthcare facilities
Agriculture (various)
Trading with various goods
Private persons with the name Anita Kohler
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Anita Kohler
Publication number: HR02-1006060788, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
AKADEHA Praxis für Psychiatrie und Psychotherapie GmbH, in Worb, CHE-385.548.236, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 135 vom 14.07.2023, Publ. 1005795488).
Firma neu:
AKADEHA Praxis für Psychiatrie und Psychotherapie GmbH in Liquidation. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Gesellschafterversammlung vom 13.06.2024 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kohler, Anita, von Langnau im Emmental, in Enggistein (Worb), Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, Liquidatorin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1005932975, Commercial Registry Office Appenzell A. Rh., (300)
AK Medservice GmbH, in Teufen (AR), CHE-114.290.885, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 90 vom 13.05.2008, S.3, Publ. 4471570).
Firma neu:
AK Medservice GmbH in Liquidation.
Domizil neu:
c/o Berit Klinik AG, Steinweg 1, 9052 Niederteufen. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Gesellschafterversammlung vom 08.01.2024 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kohler, Dr. Anita, österreichische Staatsangehörige, in Rorschacherberg, Gesellschafterin, Geschäftsführerin und Liquidatorin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin].
Publication number: HR02-1005802369, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Gehörlosen-Fürsorgeverein der Region Basel, in Basel, CHE-108.140.243, Verein (SHAB Nr. 154 vom 11.08.2022, Publ. 1005539287).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kohler, Anita, von Landiswil, in Reinach (BL), Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bolzern, Adrian Manuel, von Kriens, in Wisen (SO), Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.