Rainer Johann Kauz
domiciled in Sursee, from Wyssachen and Emmen Active mandates: Puras AG, Neax Holding AG and more Connected persons: Katharina Elisabeth Zwald Kauz, Gabriela Brechbühl-Röösli, Anna Marisa Katharina Glünkin and more You can stay up to date through "Rainer Johann Kauz", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Rainer Johann Kauz"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Rainer Johann Kauz", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Rainer Johann Kauz"
|
Places where people with the name Rainer Johann Kauz live
Sectors in which people with the name Rainer Johann Kauz work
Trading in consumer goods
Operation of other financial institutions
IT services
Trading in consumer goods
Operation of other financial institutions
IT services
Private persons with the name Rainer Johann Kauz
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Rainer Johann Kauz
Publication number: HR02-1005452622, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Puras AG, bisher in Bern, CHE-102.568.996, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 108 vom 08.06.2020, Publ. 1004904674).
Statutenänderung:
08.04.2022.
Sitz neu:
Sursee.
Domizil neu:
St. Urban-Strasse 6, 6210 Sursee.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Zwald Kauz, Katharina Elisabeth, von Hasliberg, in Sursee, Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Luzern];
Kauz, Rainer Johann, von Emmen, in Sursee, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Luzern].
Publication number: HR02-1004904674, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Puras AG, in Bern, CHE-102.568.996, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 161 vom 22.08.2019, Publ. 1004700366).
Statutenänderung:
27.05.2020.
Aktien neu:
450 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: 100 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00 und 350 Inhaberaktien zu CHF 1'000.00].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Zwald Kauz, Katharina Elisabeth, von Hasliberg, in Luzern, Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsidentin, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Kauz, Rainer Johann, von Emmen, in Luzern, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 1264589, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Theo Frey AG, in Bern, CHE-102.568.996, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 248 vom 23.12.2013, Publ. 1253423).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hangartner, Bruno, von Altstätten, in Ueberstorf, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Scherz, Verena, von Köniz, in Bern, Präsidentin, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Zwald Kauz, Katharina Elisabeth, von Hasliberg, in Luzern, Präsidentin, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Kauz, Rainer Johann, von Emmen, in Luzern, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.