Lea Stefanie Céline Kappeler
domiciled in Schindellegi, from Männedorf Active mandates: Arlewo AG, Refinanz und Beteiligungs-AG and more Connected persons: Katja Enz, Nino Kiser, Severin Emmenegger and more You can stay up to date through "Lea Stefanie Céline Kappeler", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Lea Stefanie Céline Kappeler"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Lea Stefanie Céline Kappeler", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Lea Stefanie Céline Kappeler"
|
Places where people with the name Lea Stefanie Céline Kappeler live
Sectors in which people with the name Lea Stefanie Céline Kappeler work
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Advertising services
Petroleum and natural gas production
Mail order and retail e-commerce
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Advertising services
Petroleum and natural gas production
Mail order and retail e-commerce
Private persons with the name Lea Stefanie Céline Kappeler
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Lea Stefanie Céline Kappeler
Publication number: HR02-1005912338, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Arlewo AG, in Luzern, CHE-108.022.247, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 169 vom 01.09.2023, Publ. 1005828618).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Seeger-Egli, Daniela, von Luzern, in Ebikon, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Brülisauer, Oliver, von Appenzell, in Kriens, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Luzern];
Emmenegger, Severin, von Hildisrieden, in Luzern, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Rothenburg];
Kappeler, Lea, von Männedorf, in Feusisberg, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005000504, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
ad-roller (Switzerland) GmbH, in Feusisberg, CHE-114.464.323, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 71 vom 11.04.2017, Publ. 3461867).
Statutenänderung:
09.10.2020.
Firma neu:
Distribution and Development GmbH.
Mitteilungen neu:
Die Mitteilungen der Geschäftsführung an die Gesellschafter erfolgen per Brief, E-Mail oder Telefax. [Weitere Statutenänderungen nicht publikationspflichtiger Tatsachen].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gianotti, André Thomas, von Bregaglia, in Winterthur, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 166 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wieser, Josef, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Kitzbühel (AT), Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00;
Kappeler, Lea, von Männedorf, in Feusisberg, Direktorin, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Gesellschafterin, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit 34 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00].
Publication number: 4430543, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Pharma-Lab AG, in Feusisberg, CHE-106.676.254, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 66 vom 06.04.2018, Publ. 4154557).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kappeler, Lea, von Männedorf, in Feusisberg, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.