Christoph Grünig
domiciled in Basel, from Burgistein Active mandates: Verein Kinderhuus Kolibri in Liquidation Connected persons: Sunniva Frei, Claudia Oetterli You can stay up to date through "Christoph Grünig", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christoph Grünig"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Christoph Grünig", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christoph Grünig"
|
|
Christoph Grünig
domiciled in Winterthur, from Burgistein Active mandates: Genossenschaft Wohnsinn Connected persons: Christine Nünlist Haciveliogullari, Matthias Tobler, Valérie Waibel and more You can stay up to date through "Christoph Grünig", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christoph Grünig"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Christoph Grünig", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christoph Grünig"
|
|
Christoph Grünig
domiciled in Seeberg, from Burgistein Active mandates: Scania Schweiz AG Connected persons: Curdin Baselgia, Aleksandar Bozic, Evelyne Wacker and more You can stay up to date through "Christoph Grünig", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christoph Grünig"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Christoph Grünig", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christoph Grünig"
|
Places where people with the name Christoph Grünig live
Sectors in which people with the name Christoph Grünig work
Other social services
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Dealing and repair of automobiles and motorcycles
Other social services
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Dealing and repair of automobiles and motorcycles
Private persons with the name Christoph Grünig
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Christoph Grünig
Publication number: HR02-1005919724, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Scania Schweiz AG, in Kloten, CHE-105.749.910, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 95 vom 17.05.2023, Publ. 1005748060).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Grünig, Christoph, von Burgistein, in Seeberg, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005454892, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Praxis Punkt GmbH, in Winterthur, CHE-424.143.939, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 184 vom 21.09.2012, S.0, Publ. 6858468).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Grünig, Christoph Rudolf, von Burgistein, in Winterthur, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 1'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Grünig-Fritschi, Katja, von Burgistein, in Winterthur, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: Gesellschafterin und Vorsitzende der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 19 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00].
Publication number: HR02-1005061039, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
PRS Prime Re Holding AG, in Cham, CHE-101.393.961, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 214 vom 03.11.2020, Publ. 1005013721).
Firma neu:
PRS Prime Re Holding AG in Liquidation.
Uebersetzungen der Firma neu:
(PRS Prime Re Holding SA en liquidation) (PRS Prime Re Holding Ltd in liquidation).
Aktien neu:
130'000 Namenaktien zu CHF 1.00 [bisher: 130'000 vinkulierte Namenaktien zu CHF 1.00].
Vinkulierung neu:
Die statutarische Beschränkung der Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist von Gesetzes wegen aufgehoben. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 14.12.2020 aufgelöst.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Grünig, Christoph, von Burgistein, in Oberdiessbach, Prokurist, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Räder, Berndt, von Unterägeri, in Unterägeri, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Landtwing, Leo Armin, von Zug, in Unterägeri, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift.