Pierre Erard
domiciled in Nidau, from Le Noirmont Active mandates: Autoforum GmbH in Liquidation Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Pierre Erard", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Pierre Erard"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Pierre Erard", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Pierre Erard"
|
Places where people with the name Pierre Erard live
Sectors in which people with the name Pierre Erard work
Car dealership
Car dealership
Private persons with the name Pierre Erard
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Pierre Erard
Publication number: HR02-1005759565, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
FJPAL - Fondation jurassienne pour les soins palliatifs, à Porrentruy, CHE-207.432.577, fondation (No. FOSC 39 du 24.02.2023, Publ. 1005687460).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Thiévent, Bernard Joseph Paul, de Soubey, à Alle, membre du conseil de fondation, sans droit de signature.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Erard, Pierre Yves, de Le Noirmont, à Courtedoux, membre du conseil de fondation, sans droit de signature.
Publication number: HR02-1005688883, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Autoforum GmbH, in Biel/Bienne, CHE-115.019.724, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 83 vom 29.04.2022, Publ. 1005461284).
Firma neu:
Autoforum GmbH in Liquidation. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Gesellschafterversammlung vom 21.02.2023 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Erard, Pierre, von Le Noirmont, in Nidau, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 40 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 500.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1005461284, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Autoforum GmbH, in Biel/Bienne, CHE-115.019.724, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 31 vom 14.02.2017, Publ. 3345395).
Domizil neu:
c/o Delta Management AG, Isabellenweg 3, 2503 Biel/Bienne.
Weitere Adressen:
[gestrichen: Postfach, 2501 Biel/Bienne].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Erard, Pierre, von Le Noirmont, in Nidau, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 40 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 500.00 [bisher: in Biel/Bienne].