David Cottini
domiciled in Lens, from Crans-Montana Active mandates: Société Immobilière Croix d'Air SA, Cottini David and more Connected persons: Yanick Felley, Eric Robelin, Michelangelo Mendicino and more You can stay up to date through "David Cottini", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "David Cottini"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "David Cottini", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "David Cottini"
|
Places where people with the name David Cottini live
Sectors in which people with the name David Cottini work
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Operation of restaurants
Operation of bars
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Operation of restaurants
Operation of bars
Private persons with the name David Cottini
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: David Cottini
Publication number: HR02-1005933392, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Société Immobilière Croix d'Air SA, à Crans-Montana, CHE-102.992.710, société anonyme (No. FOSC 123 du 28.06.2023, Publ. 1005780843).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Antille, René Pierre, de Sierre, à Venthône, administrateur unique, avec signature individuelle.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Felley, Yanick, de Martigny, à Crans-Montana, président du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux;
Cottini, David, de Crans-Montana, à Lens, administrateur, avec signature collective à deux;
Robelin, Eric, ressortissant français, à Crans-Montana, administrateur, avec signature collective à deux;
Mendicino, Michelangelo, de Crans-Montana, à Crans-Montana, directeur, avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: 3742487, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Faust et Cottini, à Crans-Montana, CHE-112.980.878, société en nom collectif (No. FOSC 4 du 06.01.2017, Publ. 3265885).
Nouvelle raison de commerce:
Cottini David.
Nouvelle nature juridique:
entreprise individuelle. La société en nom collectif Faust et Cottini a été dissoute et radiée suite à la sortie de l'associée Thongbai Faust;
David Cottini, jusqu'ici associé, continue les affaires en entreprise individuelle au sens de l'art. 579 CO.
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Faust, Thongbai, de Sierre, à Sierre, associée, avec signature individuelle.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Cottini, David, de Crans-Montana, à Lens, titulaire, avec signature individuelle [précédemment: associé, avec signature individuelle].
Publication number: 3265885, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Faust et Cottini, à Chermignon, CHE-112.980.878, société en nom collectif (No. FOSC 119 du 22.06.2006, p. 17, Publ. 3428652).
Nouveau siège:
Crans-Montana. [Siège modifié d'office par suite d'entrée en vigueur de la fusion des communes de Chermignon, Mollens VS, Montana et Randogne le 01.01.2017].
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Cottini, David, de Crans-Montana, à Crans-Montana, associé, avec signature individuelle [précédemment: de Randogne].