Nico Civelli
domiciled in Singapur, from Zürich Active mandates: Niconsult GmbH Connected persons: Monica Antonelli You can stay up to date through "Nico Civelli", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Nico Civelli"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Nico Civelli", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Nico Civelli"
|
Places where people with the name Nico Civelli live
Sectors in which people with the name Nico Civelli work
Services regarding management consulting
Services regarding management consulting
Private persons with the name Nico Civelli
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Nico Civelli
Publication number: 4421041, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Clarion Finanz AG in Liquidation, in Zug, CHE-108.752.067, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 185 vom 25.09.2013, Publ. 1093563).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Civelli, Nico, von Zürich, in Zumikon, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Borer, Silver, von Grindel, in Uster, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 2794291, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Niconsult GmbH, in Zürich, CHE-112.517.546, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 37 vom 22.02.2012, Publ. 6564436).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Civelli, Nico, von Zürich, in Singapur (SG), Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 19'000.00 und mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: in Zumikon];
Antonelli, Monica, von Poschiavo, in Wald ZH, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 6564436, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Niconsult GmbH, in Zürich, CH-020.4.031.717-1, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 157 vom 16.08.2011, S. 0, Publ. 6297900).
Statutenänderung:
06.02.2012.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Gesellschafter erfolgen schriftlich, per Brief oder Telefax.
Vinkulierung neu:
Vom Gesetz abweichende Abtretungsmodalitäten der Stammanteile gemäss Statuten.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kessler, Rolf, von Zürich, in Zürich, Gesellschafter, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 1'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Civelli, Nico, von Zürich, in Zumikon, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 19'000.00 und mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 19'000.00].