Harold Burke
domiciled in Maur, from Vereinigtes Königreich Active mandates: Immostruktur und Investment AG in Liquidation, Servotel AG and more Connected persons: Yaakov David Grossmann You can stay up to date through "Harold Burke", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Harold Burke"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Harold Burke", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Harold Burke"
|
Places where people with the name Harold Burke live
Sectors in which people with the name Harold Burke work
Operation of other financial institutions
Legal counsel
Services for banks and credit institutions
Fiduciary services
Operation of other financial institutions
Legal counsel
Services for banks and credit institutions
Fiduciary services
Private persons with the name Harold Burke
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Harold Burke
Publication number: HR02-1005810717, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Insight Capital GmbH, in Zürich, CHE-248.638.685, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 243 vom 14.12.2021, Publ. 1005356115).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Burke, Harold, britischer Staatsangehöriger, in Maur, Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005716538, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Immostruktur und Investment AG, in Zug, CHE-113.738.305, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 30 vom 13.02.2023, Publ. 1005676463).
Firma neu:
Immostruktur und Investment AG in Liquidation.
Weitere Adressen:
Liquidationsadresse:, c/o Balmer-Etienne AG, Bederstrasse 66, 8027 Zürich.
Aktien neu:
1'926 Namenaktien zu CHF 675.00 [bisher: 1'926 vinkulierte Namenaktien zu CHF 675.00].
Vinkulierung neu:
Die statutarische Beschränkung der Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist von Gesetzes wegen aufgehoben. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 16.03.2023 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Burke, Harold, britischer Staatsangehöriger, in Maur, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1004922334, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Naturland Europe GmbH, in Zürich, CHE-428.505.361, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 125 vom 02.07.2019, Publ. 1004664528).
Firma neu:
Naturland Europe GmbH in Liquidation. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Gesellschafterversammlung vom 16.06.2020 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Burke, Harold, britischer Staatsangehöriger, in Maur, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 12 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift].