Silvia Barben
domiciled in Thun, from Lauterbrunnen Active mandates: BWS Baumanagement GmbH Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Silvia Barben", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Silvia Barben"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Silvia Barben", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Silvia Barben"
|
|
Silvia Barben
domiciled in Spiez, from Spiez Active mandates: Stiftung Geschwister Carl und Rosa Haueter Connected persons: Peter Schmid, Marcel Roland Marti, Barbara Reber-Kernen You can stay up to date through "Silvia Barben", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Silvia Barben"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Silvia Barben", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Silvia Barben"
|
Places where people with the name Silvia Barben live
Sectors in which people with the name Silvia Barben work
Architectural and engineering activities
Other social services
Architectural and engineering activities
Other social services
Private persons with the name Silvia Barben
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Silvia Barben
Publication number: HR02-1005540755, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
BWS Baumanagement GmbH, in Spiez, CHE-114.073.916, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 116 vom 18.06.2020, Publ. 1004913479).
Statutenänderung:
09.08.2022.
Sitz neu:
Thun.
Domizil neu:
Schadaustrasse 23b, 3604 Thun.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Barben, Silvia, von Lauterbrunnen, in Thun, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: in Einigen (Spiez)].
Publication number: HR02-1004913479, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
BWS Baumanagement GmbH, in Herbligen, CHE-114.073.916, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 18 vom 26.01.2017, Publ. 3307033).
Statutenänderung:
11.06.2020.
Sitz neu:
Spiez.
Domizil neu:
Gheiweg 6d, 3646 Einigen.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schelker, Walter, von Lauterbrunnen, in Herbligen, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Barben, Silvia, von Lauterbrunnen, in Einigen (Spiez), Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: in Herbligen].
Publication number: 2773309, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Geschwister Carl und Rosa Haueter, in Spiez, CHE-109.453.443, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 27 vom 10.02.2015, Publ. 1981873).
Domizil neu:
c/o Silvia Barben, Bubenbergstrasse 11, 3700 Spiez.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Zaugg, Christian, von Lützelflüh, in Spiez, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Barben, Silvia, von Spiez, in Spiez, Vizepräsidentin des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.