Walter Ferdinand Axt
domiciled in Allschwil, from Basel Active mandates: Walter F. Axt, Unternehmungsberatung Connected persons: Susanna Elisabeth Axt-Jeuch You can stay up to date through "Walter Ferdinand Axt", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Walter Ferdinand Axt"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Walter Ferdinand Axt", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Walter Ferdinand Axt"
|
Places where people with the name Walter Ferdinand Axt live
Sectors in which people with the name Walter Ferdinand Axt work
Services regarding management consulting
Services regarding management consulting
Private persons with the name Walter Ferdinand Axt
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Walter Ferdinand Axt
Publication number: HR02-1005034797, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Gebrüder Hanspeter & Walter Axt, in Allschwil, CHE-113.194.960, Kollektivgesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 196 vom 10.10.2006, Publ. 3584684).
Firma neu:
H.P. Axt.
Sitz neu:
Therwil.
Domizil neu:
Im Rosengarten 6, 4106 Therwil.
Rechtsform neu:
Einzelunternehmen. Die Gesellschaft hat sich infolge Ausscheidens des Gesellschafters Walter Axt aufgelöst. Die Firma ist erloschen. Der Gesellschafter Hans-Peter Axt führt im Sinne von Art. 579 OR das Geschäft als Einzelunternehmen fort.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Axt, Walter Ferdinand, von Basel, in Allschwil, Gesellschafter, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Axt, Hans-Peter, von Basel, in Therwil, Inhaber, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Gesellschafter, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1004571904, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Axt Treuhand-Dienstleistungen AG, in Binningen, CHE-105.370.396, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 248 vom 22.12.2015, S.0, Publ. 2556897).
Firma neu:
Axt Treuhand-Dienstleistungen AG in Liquidation. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 06.02.2019 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Axt, Walter Ferdinand, von Basel, in Allschwil, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 2786927, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Agromach GmbH in Liq., in Binningen, CHE-110.296.647, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 31 vom 14.02.2013, Publ. 7063662).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Axt, Walter Ferdinand, von Basel, in Allschwil, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift.