Beat Andrist
domiciled in Biel-Benken BL, from Erlenbach im Simmental Active mandates: Tenum Management AG Connected persons: Moritz Kistenmacher, Roman Laubscher, Hans Jörg Luchsinger-Schmidli You can stay up to date through "Beat Andrist", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Beat Andrist"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Beat Andrist", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Beat Andrist"
|
|
Beat Andrist
domiciled in Rothenfluh, from Erlenbach im Simmental Active mandates: Garage Andrist Connected persons: Markus Bürgin You can stay up to date through "Beat Andrist", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Beat Andrist"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Beat Andrist", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Beat Andrist"
|
Places where people with the name Beat Andrist live
Sectors in which people with the name Beat Andrist work
Secretarial and office administration services
Dealing and repair of automobiles and motorcycles
Secretarial and office administration services
Dealing and repair of automobiles and motorcycles
Private persons with the name Beat Andrist
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Beat Andrist
Publication number: HR02-1006127123, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Biopower Nordwestschweiz AG, in Liestal, CHE-112.253.258, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 225 vom 18.11.2022, Publ. 1005607873).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Andrist, Beat, von Erlenbach im Simmental, in Biel-Benken, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Zimmermann, Dominik, von Mels, in Basel, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lüthy, Florian, von Basel und Lützelflüh, in Sisseln, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: von Basel und Lützelflüh, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Scheidegger, Roger, von Füllinsdorf, in Zunzgen, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Schneider, Michael, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Bottmingen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Wenger, Michael, von Forst-Längenbühl, in Bubendorf, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005522015, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Berichtigung des im SHAB Nr. 131 vom 08.07.2022 publizierten TR-Eintrags Nr. 3'504 vom 05.07.2022. Tenum Management AG, in Liestal, CHE-107.436.480, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 131 vom 08.07.2022, Publ. 1005516485).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Andrist, Beat, von Erlenbach im Simmental, in Biel-Benken, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [nicht: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005516485, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Tenum Management AG, in Liestal, CHE-107.436.480, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 236 vom 05.12.2014, S.0, Publ. 1862843).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Delbrück, Dr. Gottlieb G., deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Bottmingen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Laubscher, Roman, von Müntschemier, in Liestal, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Kistenmacher, Moritz, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Malsburg-Marzell (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Andrist, Beat, von Erlenbach im Simmental, in Biel-Benken, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.