Monique Albrecht
domiciled in Sion, from Noble-Contrée Active mandates: Fondation Château Mercier, Fondation "Divisionnaire F.K. Rünzi" and more Connected persons: Pierre-André Charbonnet, Anthony Charles Lamon, Cédric Pugin and more You can stay up to date through "Monique Albrecht", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Monique Albrecht"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Monique Albrecht", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Monique Albrecht"
|
Places where people with the name Monique Albrecht live
Sectors in which people with the name Monique Albrecht work
Trade fair, exhibition and convention organising
Religious, political or secular associations
Trade fair, exhibition and convention organising
Religious, political or secular associations
Private persons with the name Monique Albrecht
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Monique Albrecht
Publication number: HR02-1005717188, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Fondation "Divisionnaire F.K. Rünzi", à Crans-Montana, CHE-113.161.185, fondation (No. FOSC 112 du 13.06.2022, Publ. 1005494265).
Nouveau siège:
Sion.
Nouvelle adresse:
c/o Chancellerie d'Etat, Avenue de France 71, Palais du Gouvernement, Planta 3, 1950 Sion.
Autres adresses:
Case postale 670, 1950 Sion. [biffé: Bureaux : c/o Chancellerie d'Etat, Palais du Gouvernement, 1950 Sion].
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Spörri, Philipp, de Wettingen, à Veyras, secrétaire (hors-conseil), avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Albrecht, Monique, de Noble-Contrée, à Sion, secrétaire du conseil de fondation, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1005213539, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Fondation Château de Tourbillon, à Sion, CHE-110.590.762, fondation (No. FOSC 85 du 03.05.2018, Publ. 4210643).
Nouvelle adresse:
Hôtel de Ville, Rue du Grand-Pont 12, 1950 Sion 2.
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Spörri, Philippe, de Wettingen, à Veyras, vice-président, avec signature collective à deux;
Varone, Philippe, de Sion, à Sion, membre, secrétaire, avec signature collective à deux;
Syburra, Romaine, de Sion, à Sion, membre, sans droit de signature.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Albrecht, Monique, de Noble-Contrée, à Sion, vice-présidente du conseil de fondation, avec signature collective à deux;
Schmid, Carole, de Sion, à Grimisuat, membre et secrétaire du conseil de fondation, avec signature collective à deux;
Elsig, Patrick, de Sion, à Sion, membre du conseil de fondation, sans droit de signature.