Reports for Stiftung SWICA Gesundheitsorganisation
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stiftung SWICA Gesundheitsorganisation
- Stiftung SWICA Gesundheitsorganisation is currently active and the industry «Religious, political or secular associations». The legal headquarters are in St. Gallen.
- Stiftung SWICA Gesundheitsorganisation has 13 persons entered in its management.
- On the 17.06.2024 the commercial register entry of the organization was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the organization Stiftung SWICA Gesundheitsorganisation is the following: CHE-109.509.397.
Management (13)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Dr. Urs Beat Stoffel,
Petra Geiser,
Dr. iur. Carlo Dario Conti,
Dr. Ruth Fleisch-Silvestri,
Barbara Bolliger
newest authorized signatories
Dr. iur. Carlo Dario Conti,
Dr. Ruth Fleisch-Silvestri,
Barbara Bolliger,
Fabian Ehmann,
Leandro Dario Renggli
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
03.07.1982
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
St. Gallen
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.7.021.629-6
UID/VAT
CHE-109.509.397
CHE-116.301.904 VAT
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Stiftung bezweckt eine auf Kontinuität und Stabilität ausgerichtete Umsetzung der Versicherung aller Versicherten der SWICA gegen die Risiken von Unfall und Krankheit im Rahmen der obligatorischen und überobligatorischen Kranken- und Unfallversicherung. Zudem setzt sich die Stiftung für Anliegen zur Stärkung des schweizerischen Gesundheitswesens ein und kann in diesem Bereich insbesondere Projekte aus Lehre, Forschung und Prävention unterstützen. Zur Erreichung dieser Zwecksetzung kann die Stiftungen Unternehmen gründen, sich daran beteiligen, diese betreiben, diese finanzieren oder diese in anderer Weise unterstützen. Zur Wahrung der Rechte der Stiftung besteht ein Aktionärsbindungsvertrag betreffend die Firma SWICA Holding AG zwischen der SWICA Gesundheitsorganisation und der Stiftung. Der Stiftungsrat hat im Rahmen seiner Befugnisse allfällige Änderungen oder die Kündigung des Aktionärsbindungsvertrags unter der Wahrung der Rechte und im Interesse der Stiftung vorzunehmen und der Aufsichtsbehörde zur Kenntnis zu bringen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Zürich | 14.09.2007 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ernst & Young AG | Zürich | 25.09.2006 | 13.09.2007 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Stiftung für ein erweitertes Versicherungsangebot der SWICA
- Stiftung für ein erweitertes Versicherungsangebot der OSKA.
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stiftung SWICA Gesundheitsorganisation
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006058705, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Stiftung SWICA Gesundheitsorganisation, in St. Gallen, CHE-109.509.397, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 32 vom 15.02.2024, Publ. 1005962223).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Neuhaus, Daniel, von Rüderswil, in Uitikon Waldegg (Uitikon), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ehmann, Fabian, von Remigen, in Hettlingen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Wettingen].
Publication number: HR02-1005962223, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Stiftung SWICA Gesundheitsorganisation, in St. Gallen, CHE-109.509.397, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 187 vom 27.09.2023, Publ. 1005846926).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Geiser, Petra, von Homburg, in Frauenfeld, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Stoffel, Urs Beat, von Arbon, in Kilchberg ZH, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Egli, Jérôme, von Mosnang, in Sommeri, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Neukirch (Egnach)];
Ehmann, Fabian, von Remigen, in Wettingen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Winterthur].
Publication number: HR02-1005846926, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Stiftung SWICA Gesundheitsorganisation, in St. Gallen, CHE-109.509.397, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 144 vom 27.07.2023, Publ. 1005805405).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Berchtold, Peter Eduard, von Solothurn, in Bern, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.