Reports for SMAR GmbH in Liquidation
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout SMAR GmbH in Liquidation
- SMAR GmbH in Liquidation is active in the industry «Architectural and engineering activities» and is currently in liquidation. The legal headquarters are in Brunegg.
- The management has 2 active persons registered.
- On the 11.10.2023 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-109.444.852.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
16.01.2002
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Brunegg
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.4.023.109-9
UID/VAT
CHE-109.444.852
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Managementberatung und Business Development für Unternehmen der Entsorgungs- und Powertechnik sowie Entwicklung, Projektierung und Wartung von sowie Handel mit Geräten, Systemen und Anlagen dieser Produkte; kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an andern Unternehmen beteiligen sowie Grundstücke erwerben, halten und veräussern.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- SMAR GmbH
- Alois Saxer GmbH
- Saxer Alois GmbH
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: SMAR GmbH in Liquidation
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005858208, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
SMAR GmbH, in Brunegg, CHE-109.444.852, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 248 vom 21.12.2017, Publ. 3948721).
Firma neu:
SMAR GmbH in Liquidation.
Vinkulierung neu:
[Aufhebung der Bestimmung über die vom Gesetz abweichende Abtretungsmodalitäten der Stammanteile gemäss Statuten.]. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Gesellschafterversammlung vom 03.10.2023 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Saxer, Alois, von Hägglingen, in Eschenz, Gesellschafter, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift als Liquidator, mit 10 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 3948721, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
SMAR GmbH, in Würenlingen, CHE-109.444.852, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 176 vom 12.09.2014, Publ. 1712695).
Statutenänderung:
06.12.2017.
Sitz neu:
Brunegg.
Domizil neu:
Breitackerstrasse 11, 5505 Brunegg.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Saxer, Marco, von Hägglingen, in Brunegg, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 10 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: in Niederrohrdorf];
Saxer, Alois, von Hägglingen, in Eschenz, Gesellschafter, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 10 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: in Würenlingen].
Publication number: 1712695, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
SMAR GmbH, in Wettingen, CHE-109.444.852, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 130 vom 08.07.2008, S. 2, Publ. 4563382).
Statutenänderung:
03.09.2014.
Sitz neu:
Würenlingen.
Domizil neu:
Bärenweg 26, 5303 Würenlingen.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
van den Bergh, Ralph, von Ziefen, in Wettingen, Gesellschafter, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 1'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Saxer, Marco, von Hägglingen, in Niederrohrdorf, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 10 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: mit 19 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00];
Saxer, Alois, von Hägglingen, in Würenlingen, Gesellschafter, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 10 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.