Reports for YOUPLUS Assurance SCHWEIZ AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout YOUPLUS Assurance SCHWEIZ AG
- YOUPLUS Assurance SCHWEIZ AG has its legal headquarters in Pfäffikon SZ and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Operation of an insurance company».
- The management of the company YOUPLUS Assurance SCHWEIZ AG consists of 12 persons.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 12.09.2024. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- In the commercial register the company YOUPLUS Assurance SCHWEIZ AG is registered under the UID CHE-106.611.869.
- On the same address there are 6 other active companies registered. These include: Ärztenetz promedico AG, Ärztezentren Deutschschweiz AG, KONTOMED Ärztetreuhand AG.
Management (12)
newest board members
Stephan Ommerborn,
Christian Guido Lang,
Eckhard Ernst Mihr,
Gerhard Frieg,
Jens Friedrich Blohm
newest authorized signatories
Stephan Ommerborn,
Ivo Hux,
Christian Guido Lang,
Helena Radovanská,
Simon Steinbach
Executive board
Ivo Hux,
Helena Radovanská,
Simon Steinbach,
Stephanie Maria Ayer,
York Dieter Armin Engelskirchen
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
30.04.1990
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Freienbach
Commercial Registry Office
SZ
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.924.237-0
UID/VAT
CHE-106.611.869
CHE-160.588.253 VAT
Sector
Operation of an insurance company
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Betrieb jeder Art von Lebensversicherung unter Einschluss der Invaliditäts-, Unfalltod- und Krankenzusatzversicherung, der selbständigen Kranken- und Invaliditätsversicherung sowie der Rückversicherung in diesen Zweigen; kann sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Zürich | 19.08.2019 |
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
KPMG AG | Zürich | 03.07.2006 | 18.08.2019 | |
Deloitte AG | Zürich | 28.07.2004 | 02.07.2006 | |
Ernst & Young AG | Zürich | <2004 | 27.07.2004 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- YOUPLUS Assurance SVIZZERA SA
- YOUPLUS Assurance SUISSE SA
- Skandia Leben AG
- Skandia Vita SA
- Skandia Vie SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: YOUPLUS Assurance SCHWEIZ AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006127947, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
YOUPLUS Assurance SCHWEIZ AG, in Freienbach, CHE-106.611.869, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 123 vom 27.06.2024, Publ. 1006068686).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Busenhart, Christian, von Zürich, in Zürich, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien mit einem Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Engelskirchen, York, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Stäfa, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Altendorf].
Publication number: HR02-1006068686, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
YOUPLUS Assurance SCHWEIZ AG, in Freienbach, CHE-106.611.869, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 71 vom 12.04.2024, Publ. 1006007451).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Vogl, Martin, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Altendorf, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Mischler, Dr. Claus, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Wiesbaden (DE), Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ommerborn, Stephan, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Zürich, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Hux, Ivo, von Frauenfeld, in Meilen, Vorsitzender der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1006007451, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
YOUPLUS Assurance SCHWEIZ AG, in Freienbach, CHE-106.611.869, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 55 vom 19.03.2024, Publ. 1005988874).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bahc, Thomas, von Binningen, in Dornach, Vorsitzender der Geschäftsleitung (CEO), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.